SLS 17RS-128 ORIGINAL 2017 Regular Session SENATE BILL NO. 12 BY SENATOR ALARIO Prefiled pursuant to Article III, Section 2(A)(4)(b)(i) of the Constitution of Louisiana. STATE AGENCIES. Re-creates the Department of the Treasury and its agencies. (6/30/17) 1 AN ACT 2 To enact R.S. 49:191(10)(b) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(8)(g), relative to the Department of 3 the Treasury, including provisions to provide for the re-creation of the Department 4 of the Treasury and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law; to 5 provide for the effective termination date for all statutory authority for the existence 6 of such statutory entities; and to provide for related matters. 7 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 8 Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of the Treasury and the statutory 9 entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective June 30, 2017, and 10 all statutory authority therefore is continued in accordance with the provisions of Part XII 11 of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950. 12 Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of the Treasury 13 and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created by Section 1 of this Act 14 shall cease as of July 1, 2023, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the Department of the 15 Treasury may be re-created prior to such date in accordance with the provisions of Part XII 16 of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950. 17 Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that Page 1 of 3 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 12 SLS 17RS-128 ORIGINAL 1 those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act. 2 Section 4. R.S. 49:191(10)(b) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 3 ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; 4 phase-out period for statutory entities; table of dates 5 Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the 6 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their 7 its operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority 8 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of 9 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date: 10 * * * 11 (10) July 1, 2022: 12 * * * 13 (b) The Department of the Treasury and all statutory entities made a 14 part of the department by law. 15 Section 5. R.S. 49:191(8)(g) is hereby repealed in its entirety. 16 Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2017; if vetoed by the 17 governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on 18 June 30, 2017, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later. The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Martha S. Hess. DIGEST SB 12 Original 2017 Regular Session Alario Present law (sunset law) provides that the Department of the Treasury and all statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate its operations on July 1, 2018, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2019, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Department of the Treasury and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2017, in accordance with the sunset law. Proposed law supercedes the provisions of the sunset law that set out the procedures for review and re- creation and that requires a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department, along with additional provisions. Proposed law makes July 1, 2023, the new termination date, and termination would begin on July 1, 2022, unless the department is again re-created. Page 2 of 3 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 12 SLS 17RS-128 ORIGINAL Effective June 30, 2017. (Adds R.S. 49:191(10)(b); repeals R.S. 49:191(8)(g)) Page 3 of 3 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions.