Louisiana 2017 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB12 Engrossed / Bill

                    SLS 17RS-128	REENGROSSED
2017 Regular Session
SENATE BILL NO. 12
BY SENATOR ALARIO 
Prefiled pursuant to Article III, Section 2(A)(4)(b)(i) of the Constitution of Louisiana.
STATE AGENCIES.  Re-creates the Department of the Treasury and its agencies.  (6/30/17)
1	AN ACT
2 To enact R.S. 49:191(10)(b) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(8)(g), relative to the Department of
3 the Treasury, including provisions to provide for the re-creation of the Department
4 of the Treasury and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law; to
5 provide for the effective termination date for all statutory authority for the existence
6 of such statutory entities; and to provide for related matters.
7 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
8 Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of the Treasury and the statutory
9 entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective June 30, 2017, and
10 all statutory authority therefore is continued in accordance with the provisions of Part XII
11 of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.
12 Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of the Treasury
13 and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created by Section 1 of this Act
14 shall cease as of July 1, 2023, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the Department of the
15 Treasury may be re-created prior to such date in accordance with the provisions of Part XII
16 of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.
17 Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that
Page 1 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 12
SLS 17RS-128	REENGROSSED
1 those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.
2 Section 4. R.S. 49:191(10)(b) is hereby enacted to read as follows:
3 ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities;
4	phase-out period for statutory entities; table of dates
5	Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the
6 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their
7 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority
8 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of
9 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:
10	*          *          *
11	(10) July 1, 2022:
12	*          *          *
13	(b)  The Department of the Treasury and all statutory entities made a
14 part of the department by law.
15 Section 5. R.S. 49:191(8)(g) is hereby repealed in its entirety.
16 Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2017; if vetoed by the
17 governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on
18 June 30, 2017, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.
The original instrument was prepared by Martha Hess. The following digest,
which does not constitute a part of the legislative instrument, was prepared
by J. W. Wiley.
DIGEST
SB 12 Reengrossed 2017 Regular Session	Alario
Present law (sunset law) provides that the Department of the Treasury and all statutory
entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on
July 1, 2018, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2019,
unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its
statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Department of the Treasury and its
statutory entities, effective June 30, 2017, in accordance with the sunset law. Proposed law
supercedes the provisions of the sunset law that set out the procedures for review and re-
creation and that requires a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the
department, along with additional provisions. Proposed law makes July 1, 2023, the new
termination date, and termination would begin on July 1, 2022, unless the department is
again re-created.
Page 2 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 12
SLS 17RS-128	REENGROSSED
Effective June 30, 2017.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(10)(b); repeals R.S. 49:191(8)(g))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate
Senate Floor Amendments to engrossed bill
1. Makes technical change.
Page 3 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.