Louisiana 2017 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB12 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    The original instrument was prepared by Martha Hess. The following digest, which
does not constitute a part of the legislative instrument, was prepared by J. W. Wiley.
DIGEST
SB 12 Reengrossed 2017 Regular Session	Alario
Present law (sunset law) provides that the Department of the Treasury and all statutory entities made
a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2018, and that
all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2019, unless the legislature enacts
a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Department of the Treasury and its statutory
entities, effective June 30, 2017, in accordance with the sunset law. Proposed law supercedes the
provisions of the sunset law that set out the procedures for review and re-creation and that requires
a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department, along with additional
provisions. Proposed law makes July 1, 2023, the new termination date, and termination would begin
on July 1, 2022, unless the department is again re-created.
Effective June 30, 2017.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(10)(b); repeals R.S. 49:191(8)(g))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate
Senate Floor Amendments to engrossed bill
1. Makes technical change.