SLS 17RS-438 ORIGINAL 2017 Regular Session SENATE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 2 BY SENATOR LAMBERT WATER/WATERWAYS. Approves the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2017-2018, as adopted by the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority. 1 A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION 2 To approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2017-2018, as adopted by 3 the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and 4 Restoration Authority. 5 WHEREAS, R.S. 30:2000.1 et seq., provides for the creation, duties, and 6 responsibilities of the Atchafalaya Basin Program, in the office of the secretary of the 7 Department of Natural Resources, and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion 8 Board; and 9 WHEREAS, pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11, a technical advisory group has been 10 appointed to review, evaluate, and approve all water management and water quality projects 11 proposed for inclusion in an annual plan to determine if the project meets the criteria for 12 inclusion in the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan, and make recommendations to the 13 Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board; and 14 WHEREAS, public participation in the development of the Atchafalaya Basin 15 Annual Plan is essential to the success of the Atchafalaya Basin Program; and 16 WHEREAS, nominations for water quality projects were accepted from July 1, 2015, 17 through June 30, 2016, at which time the technical advisory group reviewed and evaluated 18 the water quality projects that were nominated by the public and selected projects for Page 1 of 3 SCR NO. 2 SLS 17RS-438 ORIGINAL 1 inclusion in the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(B); and 2 WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan was then presented for public 3 comment and discussion at meetings that were held on October 3, 2016, in Morgan City, 4 Louisiana; on October 4, 2016, in Bayou Sorrell, Louisiana; and on October 6, 2016, in 5 Henderson, Louisiana; and 6 WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board at a public 7 meeting held on November 3, 2016, in Baton Rouge, Louisiana, after receiving and 8 considering the comments of the public, and the recommendations of the Atchafalaya Basin 9 Program staff, unanimously approved the draft Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan; and 10 WHEREAS, the draft Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan was submitted on November 11 30, 2016, to the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority (CPRA) pursuant to R.S. 12 30:2000.11(E) for their review and approval as consistent with the master plan for coastal 13 protection and restoration for a sustainable coast and was unanimously approved by CPRA 14 at its January 18, 2017, meeting; and 15 WHEREAS, at a public meeting held on February 1, 2017, the Atchafalaya Basin 16 Research and Promotion Board, as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(D), considered and 17 unanimously approved the proposed Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan in its final version; and 18 WHEREAS, both the CPRA and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion 19 Board must approve the Annual Basin Plan prior to its submission to the legislature, and the 20 legislature may approve or disapprove the Annual Basin Plan by resolution adopted by a 21 majority vote of the members of each house of the legislature; and 22 WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Program Annual Plan shall not be effective or 23 implemented unless both houses of the legislature approve the annual plan or fail to 24 disapprove the annual plan; and 25 WHEREAS, the secretary shall implement the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan if the 26 legislature approves the plan or if the legislature fails to timely disapprove of the plan. 27 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby 28 approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2017-2018, as presented by the 29 secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and adopted by the Atchafalaya Basin 30 Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority. Page 2 of 3 SCR NO. 2 SLS 17RS-438 ORIGINAL 1 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the 2 secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and 3 Promotion Board. The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Alan Miller. DIGEST SCR 2 Original 2017 Regular Session Lambert Approves the 2017-2018 Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan. Page 3 of 3