Louisiana 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate 2017 Bills & Legislation

LA

Louisiana 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR38

Introduced
4/19/17  
Passed
4/20/17  
Commends the 2016-2017 UNO Privateers Men's Basketball team.
LA

Louisiana 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR39

Introduced
4/19/17  
Introduced
4/19/17  
Refer
4/20/17  
Urges and requests the systems to report certain investment information including amounts paid to investment professionals.
LA

Louisiana 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR4

Introduced
4/10/17  
Introduced
4/10/17  
Passed
4/10/17  
Recognizes April 11, 2017, as Louisiana Society of Anesthesiologists Day at the state capitol.
LA

Louisiana 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR40

Introduced
4/20/17  
Introduced
4/20/17  
Passed
4/20/17  
Express condolences upon the death of Daniel Phillip Ieyoub.
LA

Louisiana 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR41

Introduced
4/20/17  
Introduced
4/20/17  
Passed
4/20/17  
Commends the United Association of Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 60 upon the celebration of its 125th Anniversary of service and leadership in the community on April 22, 2017.
LA

Louisiana 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR42

Introduced
4/24/17  
Introduced
4/24/17  
Passed
4/24/17  
Designates Monday, April 24, 2017, as Tourism Day at the state capitol.
LA

Louisiana 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR43

Introduced
4/24/17  
Expresses condolences on the passing of Lucille Trahan Picard.
LA

Louisiana 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR44

Introduced
4/24/17  
Passed
4/25/17  
Recognizes Wednesday, April 26, 2017, as the fifth annual Liquefied Natural Gas Day at the state capitol and expresses support of the Louisiana Energy Export Association, LNG exports, and the streamlining and expedition of permit approval for pending export facilities.
LA

Louisiana 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR45

Introduced
4/24/17  
Passed
4/25/17  
Commends CASA programs and volunteers for the work they do to ensure safe permanent homes for Louisiana's foster children and designates April 27, 2017, as CASA Day at the state capitol.
LA

Louisiana 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR46

Introduced
4/24/17  
Recognizes the 100th anniversary of the Smith-Hughes National Vocational Education Act, designates April 27, 2017, as FFA Day at the Louisiana State Capitol, and commends the state officers of the Louisiana FFA Association.
LA

Louisiana 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR47

Introduced
4/24/17  
Introduced
4/24/17  
Passed
4/25/17  
Commends XS Martial Arts Dojo and Save One Now for presenting the 10th Annual Crescent City Kumite being held on May 20, 2017.
LA

Louisiana 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR48

Introduced
4/24/17  
Introduced
4/24/17  
Passed
4/25/17  
Expresses sincere and heartfelt condolences on the death of Scott Anthony Brooks.
LA

Louisiana 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR49

Introduced
4/24/17  
Recognizes October 2017 as Dyslexia Awareness Month and requests schools and state and local educational agencies to address the significant educational implications of dyslexia.
LA

Louisiana 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR5

Introduced
4/10/17  
Introduced
4/10/17  
Passed
4/10/17  
Recognizes April 11, 2017, as Louisiana Athletic Trainers Association Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
LA

Louisiana 2017 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR50

Introduced
4/26/17  
Recognizes April 27, 2017, as Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records