Louisiana 2018 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB109 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    RÉSUMÉ DIGEST
ACT 6 (HB 109) 2018 Regular Session	Hoffmann
Prior law (Sunset) provided that the Dept. of Children and Family Services and all statutory
entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on
July 1, 2018, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2019,
unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its
statutory entities prior thereto.
New law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Children and Family Services
and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2018, in accordance with the "sunset" law. New
law sets out the procedure for review and the re-creation which require a separate bill to re-
create each statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. New law
makes July 1, 2023, the new termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2022,
unless the department is re-created again.
Effective June 30, 2018.
 
(Adds R.S. 49:191(10)(c); Repeals R.S. 49:191(8)(e))