Louisiana 2018 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB142 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 18RS-314	RE-REENGROSSED
2018 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 142
BY REPRESENTATIVE LYONS
ENVIRONMENT/WASTE TIRES:  Increases the waste tire disposal fee applicable to
passenger and light truck tires
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 30:2418(I)(1), relative to waste tires; to provide for fees levied
3 on certain tires; to increase the fee on certain tires for a certain period of time; and
4 to provide for related matters.
5Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
6 Section 1.  R.S. 30:2418(I)(1) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows:
7 ยง2418.  Waste tires
8	*          *          *
9	I.(1)(a)  The fee on tires authorized to be levied pursuant to R.S.
10 30:2413(A)(8) shall not exceed the following:
11	(i)  Beginning October 1, 2018, through July 31, 2022, two dollars and
12 twenty-five cents per passenger/light truck/small farm service tire.  Beginning on
13 August 1, 2022, two dollars per passenger/light truck/small farm service tire,. 
14	(ii)  five Five dollars per medium truck tire,.
15	(iii)  and ten Ten dollars per off-road tire.
16	(b)  The secretary may provide for exemptions from the fees levied on the
17 sale of tires pursuant to this Chapter in the regulations provided for in Subsection H
18 of this Section for the sale of tires sold at wholesale and certain tires which are de
19 minimis in nature, including but not limited to lawn mower tires, bicycle tires, and
20 golf cart tires.  After June 1, 2004, the secretary may provide for the exemption of
Page 1 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 18RS-314	RE-REENGROSSED
HB NO. 142
1 certain tire sales from the fee which tires were not previously exempted only through
2 the department's rulemaking authority, including legislative oversight as provided
3 in R.S. 30:2413(A)(8).
4	*          *          *
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 142 Re-Reengrossed 2018 Regular Session	Lyons
Abstract:  Increases the waste tire fee collected for passenger/light truck/small farm service
tires from $2 per tire to $2.25 per tire beginning October 1, 2018, through July 31,
2022.
Present law provides that $2 per passenger/light truck/small farm service tires, $5 per
medium truck tire, and $10 per off-road tire be collected for every tire sold.  These fees are
deposited into the Waste Tire Management Fund which is used to operate the waste tire
program in the Dept. of Environmental Quality.  One aspect of that program is to reimburse
waste tire processors from the fund for scrapping waste tires generated within the state.
Proposed law increases the fees per passenger/light truck/small farm service tire from $2 to
$2.25 beginning Oct. 1, 2018, through July 31, 2022.  Proposed law provides that beginning
Aug. 1, 2022, the fee per passenger/light truck/small farm service tire will be $2.
(Amends R.S. 30:2418(I)(1))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Appropriations to the
engrossed bill:
1. Sunset the fee increase per passenger/light truck/small farm service tire on July
31, 2022.
The House Floor Amendments to the reengrossed bill:
1. Begin the fee increase on Oct. 1, 2018.
Page 2 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.