HLS 18RS-581 ORIGINAL 2018 Regular Session HOUSE BILL NO. 155 BY REPRESENTATIVE STOKES TAX COMMISSION, STATE: Increases the fees levied by the La. Tax Commission for assessment of certain properties 1 AN ACT 2To amend and reenact R.S. 47:1838(introductory paragraph) and (1) through (3), relative to 3 ad valorem property tax assessments by the Louisiana Tax Commission; to authorize 4 the imposition of certain assessment fees; to provide for the amount of certain 5 assessment fees; to provide for effectiveness; and to provide for related matters. 6Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 7 Section 1. R.S. 47:1838(introductory paragraph) and (1) through (3) are hereby 8amended and reenacted to read as follows: 9 ยง1838. Fees 10 The tax commission is hereby authorized on an interim basis for the period 11 beginning on July 1, 2014 2018, and ending on June 30, 2018 2022, to levy and 12 collect the following fees in connection with services performed by the commission: 13 (1) A fee for the assessment of public service properties at the rate of five 14 hundredths of one percent of the assessed value of such properties to be paid by each 15 public service property which pays ad valorem taxes at the following rates: 16 (a) For the period beginning on July 1, 2014, and ending on June 30, 2016, 17 one hundredth of one percent of the assessed value of the property. 18 (b) For the period beginning on July 1, 2016, and ending on June 30, 2018, 19 four hundredths of one percent of the assessed value of the property. Page 1 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 18RS-581 ORIGINAL HB NO. 155 1 (2) A fee for the assessment of insurance companies, at the rate of fifteen- 2 thousandths three hundredths of one percent of the assessed value of such properties 3 to be paid by each insurance company which pays ad valorem taxes. 4 (3) A fee for the assessment of financial institutions, at the rate of fifteen- 5 thousandths three hundredths of one percent of the assessed value of such properties 6 to be paid by each bank stock and loan and finance company which pays ad valorem 7 taxes. 8 * * * 9 Section 2. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2018. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 155 Original 2018 Regular Session Stokes Abstract: Continues authority of the La. Tax Commission to impose fees for the assessment of public service, insurance company, and financial institution properties, and increases the amount of the fees. Present law authorizes the La. Tax Commission to impose fees for the assessment of public service, insurance company, and financial institution properties. The fee amounts authorized for the period beginning July 1, 2014, and ending June 30, 2018, are: (1).0004% for public service properties (2).000015% for insurance companies (3).000015% for financial institutions Proposed law changes present law by extending the authority to impose the fee for the period of July 1, 2018, through June 30, 2022, and by increasing the amount of the fees as follows: (1)Public service properties, from .0004% to .0005% (2)Insurance companies, from .000015% to .00003% (3)Financial institutions, from .000015% to .00003% Effective July 1, 2018. (Amends R.S. 47:1838(intro. para.) and (1) - (3)) Page 2 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions.