Louisiana 2018 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB155 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 18RS-581	ENGROSSED
2018 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 155
BY REPRESENTATIVE STOKES
TAX COMMISSION, STATE:  Increases the fees levied by the La. Tax Commission for
assessment of certain properties
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 47:1838(introductory paragraph) and (1) through (3), relative to
3 ad valorem property tax assessments by the Louisiana Tax Commission; to authorize
4 the imposition of certain assessment fees; to provide for the amount of certain
5 assessment fees; to provide for effectiveness; and to provide for related matters.
6Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
7 Section 1.  R.S. 47:1838(introductory paragraph) and (1) through (3) are hereby
8amended and reenacted to read as follows: 
9 ยง1838.  Fees
10	The tax commission is hereby authorized on an interim basis for the period
11 beginning on July 1, 2014 2018, and ending on June 30, 2018 2022, to levy and
12 collect the following fees in connection with services performed by the commission:
13	(1)  A fee for the assessment of public service properties at the rate of four
14 hundredths of one percent of the assessed value of such properties to be paid by each
15 public service property which pays ad valorem taxes at the following rates:
16	(a)  For the period beginning on  July 1, 2014, and ending on June 30, 2016,
17 one hundredth of one percent of the assessed value of the property.
18	(b)  For the period beginning on  July 1, 2016, and ending on June 30, 2018,
19 four hundredths of one percent of the assessed value of the property.
Page 1 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 18RS-581	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 155
1	(2)  A fee for the assessment of insurance companies, at the rate of fifteen-
2 thousandths three hundredths of one percent of the assessed value of such properties
3 to be paid by each insurance company which pays ad valorem taxes.
4	(3)  A fee for the assessment of financial institutions, at the rate of fifteen-
5 thousandths three hundredths of one percent of the assessed value of such properties
6 to be paid by each bank stock and loan and finance company which pays ad valorem
7 taxes.
8	*          *          *
9 Section 2.  This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2018.
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 155 Engrossed 2018 Regular Session	Stokes
Abstract:  Continues authority of the La. Tax Commission to impose fees for the
assessment of public service, insurance company, and financial institution properties,
and increases the amount of the fees for assessment of insurance companies and
financial institutions.
Present law authorizes the La. Tax Commission to impose fees for the assessment of public
service, insurance company, and financial institution properties.  The fee amounts authorized
for the period beginning July 1, 2014, and ending June 30, 2018, are: 
(1).0004% for public service properties
(2).000015% for insurance companies
(3).000015% for financial institutions
Proposed law changes present law concerning the fees payable for the assessment of public
service properties by extending the authority for imposition of the fee for the period from
July 1, 2018 through June 30, 2022.
Proposed law changes present law concerning the fees payable for the assessment of
insurance companies and financial institutions by extending the authority to impose the fee
for the period of July 1, 2018, through June 30, 2022, and by increasing the amount of the
fees as follows:
(1)Insurance companies, from .000015% to .0003%
(2)Financial institutions, from .000015% to .0003%
Effective July 1, 2018.
(Amends R.S. 47:1838(intro. para.) and (1) - (3))
Page 2 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 18RS-581	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 155
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Ways and Means to the
original bill:
1. Remove the fee increase on assessments of public service properties.
Page 3 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.