Louisiana 2018 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB155 Enrolled / Bill

                    ENROLLED
2018 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 155
BY REPRESENTATIVE STOKES
1	AN ACT
2 To amend and reenact R.S. 47:1838(introductory paragraph) and (1) through (3), relative to
3 ad valorem property tax assessments by the Louisiana Tax Commission; to authorize
4 the imposition of certain assessment fees; to provide for the amount of certain
5 assessment fees; to provide for effectiveness; and to provide for related matters.
6 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
7 Section 1.  R.S. 47:1838(introductory paragraph) and (1) through (3) are hereby
8 amended and reenacted to read as follows: 
9 ยง1838.  Fees
10	The tax commission is hereby authorized on an interim basis for the period
11 beginning on July 1, 2014 2018, and ending on June 30, 2018 2022, to levy and
12 collect the following fees in connection with services performed by the commission:
13	(1)  A fee for the assessment of public service properties at the rate of four
14 hundredths of one percent of the assessed value of such properties to be paid by each
15 public service property which pays ad valorem taxes at the following rates:
16	(a)  For the period beginning on  July 1, 2014, and ending on June 30, 2016,
17 one hundredth of one percent of the assessed value of the property.
18	(b)  For the period beginning on  July 1, 2016, and ending on June 30, 2018,
19 four hundredths of one percent of the assessed value of the property.
20	(2)  A fee for the assessment of insurance companies, at the rate of fifteen-
21 thousandths three hundredths of one percent of the assessed value of such properties
22 to be paid by each insurance company which pays ad valorem taxes.
Page 1 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HB NO. 155	ENROLLED
1	(3)  A fee for the assessment of financial institutions, at the rate of fifteen-
2 thousandths three hundredths of one percent of the assessed value of such properties
3 to be paid by each bank stock and loan and finance company which pays ad valorem
4 taxes.
5	*          *          *
6 Section 2.  This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2018.
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF LOUISIANA
APPROVED:  
Page 2 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.