Louisiana 2018 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB8 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law
or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 8 Engrossed	2018 Regular Session	Ivey
Abstract:  Requires the payment of employer contributions for all retirees who return to work in a
position covered by the Clerks' of Court Retirement and Relief Fund (the system) and
extends the time period during which a retiree may return to work without benefit reduction.
Present law allows retirees of the system to be temporarily reemployed by a clerk without becoming
a member of the system during such reemployment.  Present law further provides that if the retiree
is reemployed in any capacity for more than the equivalent of 60 working days during any calendar
year, the retirement benefits shall be reduced by the amount he earned after 60 working days. 
Proposed law increases the time period that a retiree may work during a calendar year without benefit
reduction from 60 working days to 630 hours.
Present law requires that employers remit employer contributions to the system while the member
is an active member.  Proposed law requires that employers pay employer contributions to the system
as provided by present law during any period of reemployment on or after June 30, 2018.  Proposed
law applies to retirees who return to work in part-time or full-time positions.  Upon termination of
reemployment, proposed law provides for the system to retain the employer contributions and
interest on such contributions.
Present law provides that a retiree who was receiving retirement benefits from the system on Jan.
1, 2007, may be reemployed by a clerk whose office is located in a parish designated under the
Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act as eligible for individual assistance
or individual and public assistance following hurricane Katrina or Rita without benefit reduction for
up to 180 working days.  Present law provides that such provision, except as it applies to retirees
reemployed by the clerk of the Orleans Parish Civil District Court, expired on July 1, 2012.  Present
law further provides for temporary reemployment of a retiree employed by the clerk of the Orleans
Parish Civil District Court on or before June 30, 2012, under the same conditions.  Present law
provides that such provision expired on July 1, 2013.  Proposed law repeals present law.
Present law provides that a retiree who was receiving retirement benefits from the system on Jan.
1, 2007, and who is temporarily reemployed by the Orleans Parish Civil District Court on or before
June 30, 2012, may work for a period of 90 working days during a calendar year.  Present law
provides that such provision expired on July 1, 2014.  Proposed law repeals present law.
Effective July 1, 2018.
(Amends R.S. 11:1513(A) and (B); Repeals R.S. 11:1513(C) and (D)) Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Retirement to the original bill:
1. Change reemployment period provided by proposed law from 90 days to 630 hours.