Louisiana 2018 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB8 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    RÉSUMÉ DIGEST
ACT 108 (HB 8) 2018 Regular Session	Ivey
Existing law allows retirees of the Clerks' of Court Retirement and Relief Fund (the system)
to be temporarily reemployed by a clerk without becoming a member of the system during
such reemployment.  Further provides that if the retiree is reemployed in any capacity for
more than a specified period during any calendar year, his retirement benefits shall be
reduced by the amount he earned after such period.  Prior law provided that the specified
period was 60 working days.  New law provides that it is 630 hours.
Existing law requires that employers make employer contributions to the system while the
member is an active member.  New law requires employers to make employer contributions
to the system during any period of reemployment on or after June 30, 2018, whether the
retiree is employed in a part-time or full-time position.  Upon termination of reemployment,
new law provides for the system to retain the employer contributions and interest on such
contributions.
Prior law provided that a retiree who was receiving retirement benefits from the system on
Jan. 1, 2007, could be reemployed by a clerk whose office was located in a parish designated
under the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act as eligible for
individual assistance or individual and public assistance following hurricane Katrina or Rita,
without benefit reduction, for up to 180 working days.  Prior law provided that such
provision, except as it applied to retirees reemployed by the clerk of the Orleans Parish Civil
District Court, expired on July 1, 2012.  Prior law further provided for temporary
reemployment of a retiree employed by the clerk of the Orleans Parish Civil District Court
on or before June 30, 2012, under the same conditions.  Prior law provided that such
provision expired on July 1, 2013.  New law repeals prior law.
Prior law provided that a retiree who was receiving retirement benefits from the system on
Jan. 1, 2007, and who was temporarily reemployed by the Orleans Parish Civil District Court
on or before June 30, 2012, could work for a period of 90 working days during a calendar
year.  Prior law provided that such provision expired on July 1, 2014.  New law repeals prior
law.
Effective July 1, 2018.
(Amends R.S. 11:1513(A) and (B); Repeals R.S. 11:1513(C) and (D))