Louisiana 2018 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR25 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 18RS-1384	ORIGINAL
2018 Regular Session
HOUSE RESOLUTION NO. 25
BY REPRESENTATIVE JAMES
COMMENDATIONS:  Commends Jesse Bernard Bilberry, Jr., on his thirty-fourth
anniversary as pastor of Mount Pilgrim Baptist Church
1	A RESOLUTION
2To commend the Reverend Doctor Jesse Bernard Bilberry, Jr., on the blessed celebration,
3 March 11, 2018, of his thirty-fourth anniversary as pastor of Mount Pilgrim Baptist
4 Church in Baton Rouge.
5 WHEREAS, born May 12, 1929, in Marion, Louisiana, Jesse Bilberry, Jr., is the
6eldest son of the late Reverend Jesse Bernard Bilberry, Sr., and Joe B. Bilberry; and
7 WHEREAS, Jesse Bilberry confessed Christ and was baptized at the age of fourteen
8at Blooming Grove Baptist Church in Farmerville, Louisiana; and
9 WHEREAS, Mr. Bilberry became the first of ten siblings to graduate from Southern
10University and Agricultural & Mechanical College, a rare achievement in number of siblings
11graduated from Southern University; after graduating in 1951, Jesse answered the call of his
12country by serving in the United States Army and was honorably discharged in 1953; and
13 WHEREAS, on December 23, 1953, Jesse Bilberry married Verta Lee Hamilton and
14the couple was blessed with a beautiful daughter, Cassandra Gail Bilberry; and
15 WHEREAS, Mr. Bilberry received a master's degree in education from Louisiana
16State University in 1957 while serving as principal at Tensas Rosenwald High School in
17St. Joseph from 1956-1969; and
18 WHEREAS, upon his return to Southern University in 1969, Mr. Bilberry's
19experience and skills led to several collegiate appointments: he was director of the freshman
20complex, he organized and directed the first Office of High School Relations, he was
21director of admissions, and he served on the board of supervisors; and
Page 1 of 4 HLS 18RS-1384	ORIGINAL
HR NO. 25
1 WHEREAS, Jesse Bilberry united with Mount Pilgrim Baptist Church in 1975 and
2was ordained as a deacon; he also served as chairman of the finance committee; and
3 WHEREAS, the academic training of Jesse B. Bilberry, Jr., provided a solid
4foundation for his eventual transition to teach and preach the Word of God: he accepted the
5call to the gospel ministry in 1981 and was appointed as an associate minister at Mount
6Pilgrim; and
7 WHEREAS, on January 15, 1984, Reverend Bilberry was called to pastor Mount
8Pilgrim Baptist Church and began in earnest the anointed task of shepherding the Mount
9Pilgrim flock; and
10 WHEREAS, fueled by a desire to learn more about the God he faithfully served,
11Pastor Bilberry earned a master of theology degree from Christian Bible College in 1988 and
12a doctor of theology degree in 1990; and
13 WHEREAS, Pastor Bilberry was recognized as Minister of the Year in 1989 by the
14Early Risers Kiwanis Club and is a two-time recipient of the M.S. Tally Walk on the Water
15Award from the Department of Christian Education, Sunday School Publishing Board,
16National Baptist Convention, USA, Inc.; and
17 WHEREAS, Pastor Bilberry led delegations on missionary journeys to Dominica,
18West Indies, for two decades; he received the Frontiersman Award in 1993 for his foreign
19mission ministry; and
20 WHEREAS, Pastor Bilberry served twelve years as a member of the Southern
21University and A&M College board of supervisors; from 2009-2012 he served as chairman
22of the board of directors of Crestworth Learning Academy; Pastor Bilberry was president
23and moderator of the Fourth District Missionary Baptist Association from 2010-2015; and
24 WHEREAS, leaders and members of the National Baptist Convention U.S.A.,
25Incorporated, recognized Pastor Bilberry as "Mr. Christian Education" in 2005 with a
26Director's Award; Pastor Bilberry served as a supervisor and instructor in the National
27Baptist Congress of Christian Education; and at the distinguished age of eighty-nine, Pastor
28Bilberry continues to serve as director of the Louisiana State Baptist Congress of Christian
29Education; he is a member of the East Baton Rouge Parish Ministers Conference, Phi Beta
30Sigma Fraternity, and Phi Delta Kappa Honorary Society; and
Page 2 of 4 HLS 18RS-1384	ORIGINAL
HR NO. 25
1 WHEREAS, one of the highest honors of the National Baptist Convention, U.S.A.,
2Incorporated, was conferred upon Pastor Bilberry by the Sunday School Publishing Board,
3which is the publication subsidiary of the convention: he received the Dedicated Services
4and Loyalty Award on November 29, 2017; and
5 WHEREAS, Pastor Bilberry considers spiritual growth to be the most precious of
6Christian goals, and he strives daily to learn, know, and teach more about his Lord; since
71984, his stewardship at Mount Pilgrim Baptist Church has focused on teaching the precepts
8of God's Word to the flock and enlarging the territory of the church; under his pastorate, the
9Education Center, the Outreach Center, and the Family Life Center have been added to the
10church; its properties now encompass a city block on Scenic Highway; and
11 WHEREAS, in this season of his ministry, Pastor Bilberry has redoubled his efforts
12to bring the lost to Christ; the theme for his thirty-fourth anniversary celebration is
13appropriately titled, "A Worthy Watchman: Praising God for the Gift"; Pastor Bilberry has
14faithfully executed his duty as shepherd keeping watch over the flock at Mount Pilgrim
15Baptist Church and has earned the accolades of the theme Scripture, 1 Timothy 5:17: "The
16elders who direct the affairs of the church well are worthy of double honor, especially those
17whose work is preaching and teaching"; and
18 WHEREAS, Pastor Bilberry exhibits the true Christian characteristics of godliness,
19obedience, humility, commitment, dedication, and perseverance; it is fitting to recognize the
20imprint of his thirty-four years of ministry in the lives of the congregation at Mount Pilgrim
21Baptist Church and in the Christian community of Baton Rouge, the state of Louisiana, and
22the nation.
23 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the
24Legislature of Louisiana does hereby express hearty congratulations to the Reverend Doctor
25Jesse B. Bilberry, Jr., on the happy occasion of his thirty-fourth anniversary as pastor of
26Mount Pilgrim Baptist Church; does hereby commend him for the steadfast commitment to
27the call of God on his life; does hereby commend his continuation of the proud heritage of
28his earthly father and for consistently carrying out the commands of his Heavenly Father;
29does hereby extend best wishes to Pastor Bilberry and his family and the congregation as
Page 3 of 4 HLS 18RS-1384	ORIGINAL
HR NO. 25
1they celebrate thirty-four happy years of the spiritual marriage of this pastor to this church;
2and does hereby offer prayers and hopes for many more years of faithful service to God.
3 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a suitable copy of this Resolution be transmitted
4to the Reverend Doctor Jesse B. Bilberry, Jr.
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HR 25 Original 2018 Regular Session	James
Commends Rev. Jesse Bilberry, Jr., on his 34th pastoral anniversary.
Page 4 of 4