Louisiana 2018 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR25 Enrolled / Bill

                    ENROLLED
2018 Regular Session
HOUSE RESOLUTION NO. 25
BY REPRESENTATIVE JAMES
A RESOLUTION
To commend the Reverend Doctor Jesse Bernard Bilberry, Jr., on the blessed celebration,
March 11, 2018, of his thirty-fourth anniversary as pastor of Mount Pilgrim Baptist
Church in Baton Rouge.
WHEREAS, born May 12, 1929, in Marion, Louisiana, Jesse Bilberry, Jr., is the
eldest son of the late Reverend Jesse Bernard Bilberry, Sr., and Joe B. Bilberry; and
WHEREAS, Jesse Bilberry confessed Christ and was baptized at the age of fourteen
at Blooming Grove Baptist Church in Farmerville, Louisiana; and
WHEREAS, Mr. Bilberry became the first of ten siblings to graduate from Southern
University and Agricultural & Mechanical College, a rare achievement in number of siblings
graduated from Southern University; after graduating in 1951, Jesse answered the call of his
country by serving in the United States Army and was honorably discharged in 1953; and
WHEREAS, on December 23, 1953, Jesse Bilberry married Verta Lee Hamilton and
the couple was blessed with a beautiful daughter, Cassandra Gail Bilberry; and
WHEREAS, Mr. Bilberry received a master's degree in education from Louisiana
State University in 1957 while serving as principal at Tensas Rosenwald High School in
St. Joseph from 1956-1969; and
WHEREAS, upon his return to Southern University in 1969, Mr. Bilberry's
experience and skills led to several collegiate appointments: he was director of the freshman
complex, he organized and directed the first Office of High School Relations, he was
director of admissions, and he served on the board of supervisors; and
WHEREAS, Jesse Bilberry united with Mount Pilgrim Baptist Church in 1975 and
was ordained as a deacon; he also served as chairman of the finance committee; and
WHEREAS, the academic training of Jesse B. Bilberry, Jr., provided a solid
foundation for his eventual transition to teach and preach the Word of God: he accepted the
Page 1 of 3 HR NO. 25	ENROLLED
call to the gospel ministry in 1981 and was appointed as an associate minister at Mount
Pilgrim; and
WHEREAS, on January 15, 1984, Reverend Bilberry was called to pastor Mount
Pilgrim Baptist Church and began in earnest the anointed task of shepherding the Mount
Pilgrim flock; and
WHEREAS, fueled by a desire to learn more about the God he faithfully served,
Pastor Bilberry earned a master of theology degree from Christian Bible College in 1988 and
a doctor of theology degree in 1990; and
WHEREAS, Pastor Bilberry was recognized as Minister of the Year in 1989 by the
Early Risers Kiwanis Club and is a two-time recipient of the M.S. Tally Walk on the Water
Award from the Department of Christian Education, Sunday School Publishing Board,
National Baptist Convention, USA, Inc.; and
WHEREAS, Pastor Bilberry led delegations on missionary journeys to Dominica,
West Indies, for two decades; he received the Frontiersman Award in 1993 for his foreign
mission ministry; and
WHEREAS, Pastor Bilberry served twelve years as a member of the Southern
University and A&M College board of supervisors; from 2009-2012 he served as chairman
of the board of directors of Crestworth Learning Academy; Pastor Bilberry was president
and moderator of the Fourth District Missionary Baptist Association from 2010-2015; and
WHEREAS, leaders and members of the National Baptist Convention U.S.A.,
Incorporated, recognized Pastor Bilberry as "Mr. Christian Education" in 2005 with a
Director's Award; Pastor Bilberry served as a supervisor and instructor in the National
Baptist Congress of Christian Education; and at the distinguished age of eighty-nine, Pastor
Bilberry continues to serve as director of the Louisiana State Baptist Congress of Christian
Education; he is a member of the East Baton Rouge Parish Ministers Conference, Phi Beta
Sigma Fraternity, and Phi Delta Kappa Honorary Society; and
WHEREAS, one of the highest honors of the National Baptist Convention, U.S.A.,
Incorporated, was conferred upon Pastor Bilberry by the Sunday School Publishing Board,
which is the publication subsidiary of the convention: he received the Dedicated Services
and Loyalty Award on November 29, 2017; and
Page 2 of 3 HR NO. 25	ENROLLED
WHEREAS, Pastor Bilberry considers spiritual growth to be the most precious of
Christian goals, and he strives daily to learn, know, and teach more about his Lord; since
1984, his stewardship at Mount Pilgrim Baptist Church has focused on teaching the precepts
of God's Word to the flock and enlarging the territory of the church; under his pastorate, the
Education Center, the Outreach Center, and the Family Life Center have been added to the
church; its properties now encompass a city block on Scenic Highway; and
WHEREAS, in this season of his ministry, Pastor Bilberry has redoubled his efforts
to bring the lost to Christ; the theme for his thirty-fourth anniversary celebration is
appropriately titled, "A Worthy Watchman: Praising God for the Gift"; Pastor Bilberry has
faithfully executed his duty as shepherd keeping watch over the flock at Mount Pilgrim
Baptist Church and has earned the accolades of the theme Scripture, 1 Timothy 5:17: "The
elders who direct the affairs of the church well are worthy of double honor, especially those
whose work is preaching and teaching"; and
WHEREAS, Pastor Bilberry exhibits the true Christian characteristics of godliness,
obedience, humility, commitment, dedication, and perseverance; it is fitting to recognize the
imprint of his thirty-four years of ministry in the lives of the congregation at Mount Pilgrim
Baptist Church and in the Christian community of Baton Rouge, the state of Louisiana, and
the nation.
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the
Legislature of Louisiana does hereby express hearty congratulations to the Reverend Doctor
Jesse B. Bilberry, Jr., on the happy occasion of his thirty-fourth anniversary as pastor of
Mount Pilgrim Baptist Church; does hereby commend him for the steadfast commitment to
the call of God on his life; does hereby commend his continuation of the proud heritage of
his earthly father and for consistently carrying out the commands of his Heavenly Father;
does hereby extend best wishes to Pastor Bilberry and his family and the congregation as
they celebrate thirty-four happy years of the spiritual marriage of this pastor to this church;
and does hereby offer prayers and hopes for many more years of faithful service to God.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a suitable copy of this Resolution be transmitted
to the Reverend Doctor Jesse B. Bilberry, Jr.
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Page 3 of 3