SLS 18RS-569 REENGROSSED 2018 Regular Session SENATE BILL NO. 248 BY SENATOR JOHNS CHILDREN'S CODE. Revises definition of "children" in the Children's Code. (gov sig) 1 AN ACT 2 To amend and reenact Children's Code Art. 804(1), relative to children; to provide certain 3 definitions; to provide certain terms, conditions, and procedures; and to provide for 4 related matters. 5 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 6 Section 1. Children's Code Art. 804(1) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as 7 follows: 8 Art. 804. Definitions 9 As used in this Title: 10 (1)(a)"Child" means any person under the age of twenty-one, including an 11 emancipated minor, who commits a delinquent act before attaining seventeen years 12 of age. 13 (b) After June 30, 2018 On March 1, 2019, "child" means any person under 14 the age of twenty-one, including an emancipated minor, who commits a delinquent 15 act on or after July 1, 2018 March 1, 2019, when the act is not a crime of violence 16 as defined in R.S. 14:2, and occurs before the person attains eighteen years of age, 17 provided that the office of juvenile justice certifies on or before January 1, 2019, Page 1 of 3 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 248 SLS 18RS-569 REENGROSSED 1 that there is adequate funding and resources available to accommodate the 2 projected increase in caseload. 3 (c)(i) After June 30, 2020 On March 1, 2020, "child" means any person 4 under the age of twenty-one, including an emancipated minor, who commits a 5 delinquent act on or after July March 1, 2020, and before the person attains eighteen 6 years of age. 7 (ii) Notwithstanding Item (i) of this Subparagraph, a child who has attained 8 the age of seventeen shall be subject to criminal jurisdiction pursuant to Article 305 9 or 857. 10 * * * 11 Section 2. This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not 12 signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature 13 by the governor, as provided by Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana. If 14 vetoed by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become 15 effective on the day following such approval. The original instrument was prepared by Xavier I. Alexander. The following digest, which does not constitute a part of the legislative instrument, was prepared by Nancy Vicknair. DIGEST SB 248 Reengrossed 2018 Regular Session Johns Present law provides for the definition of "child" in the Children's Code. Present law provides that, after June 30, 2018, "child" means any person under the age of 21 including an emancipated minor, who commits a delinquent act on or after July 1, 2018, when the act is not a crime of violence and occurs before the person attains 18 years of age. Proposed law revises present law and provides that on March 1, 2019, "child" means any person under the age of 21, including an emancipated minor, who commits a delinquent act on or after March 1, 2019, when the act is not a crime of violence as defined in R.S. 14:2 and occurs before the person attains 18 years of age, provided that the office of juvenile justice certifies on or before January 1, 2019, that there is adequate funding and resources available to accommodate the projected increase in caseload. Present law provides that after June 30, 2020, "child" means any person under the age of 21, including an emancipated minor, who commits a delinquent act on or after July 1, 2020, and before the person attains 18 years of age. Proposed law revises present law and provides that on March 1, 2020, "child" means any person under the age of 21, including an emancipated minor, who commits a delinquent act on or after March 1, 2020, and before the person attains 18 years of age. Page 2 of 3 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 248 SLS 18RS-569 REENGROSSED Effective upon signature of the governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action. (Amends Ch.C.Art. 804(1)) Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate Committee Amendments Proposed by Senate Committee on Judiciary A to the original bill 1. Revises definition to provide language as of March 1, 2019. Senate Floor Amendments to engrossed bill 1. Clarifies definition of "child" relative to delinquency provisions in the Children's Code. Page 3 of 3 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions.