The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Xavier I. Alexander. DIGEST SB 248 Original 2018 Regular Session Johns Present law provides for the definition of "child" in the Children's Code. Present law provides that, after June 30, 2018, "child" means any person under the age of 21 including an emancipated minor, who commits a delinquent act on or after July 1, 2018, when the act is not a crime of violence and occurs before the person attains 18 years of age. Proposed law deletes this language. Present law provides that after June 30, 2020, "child" means any person under the age of 21, including an emancipated minor, who commits a delinquent act on or after July 1, 2020, and before the person attains 18 years of age. Proposed law provides that after June 30, 2020, "child" means any person under the age of 21, including an emancipated minor, who commits a delinquent act on or after July 1, 2020, and before the person attains 18 years of age, if the office of juvenile justice certifies on or before January 1, 2020, that there is adequate funding and resources available to accommodate the projected increase in caseload. Effective upon signature of the governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action. (Amends Ch.C.Art. 804(1))