Louisiana 2018 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB248 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    The original instrument was prepared by Xavier I. Alexander. The following digest,
which does not constitute a part of the legislative instrument, was prepared by Jerry
G. Jones.
DIGEST
SB 248 Engrossed	2018 Regular Session	Johns
Present law provides for the definition of "child" in the Children's Code. 
Present law provides that, after June 30, 2018, "child" means any person under the age of 21
including an emancipated minor, who commits a delinquent act on or after July 1, 2018, when the
act is not a crime of violence and occurs before the person attains 18 years of age.
Proposed law deletes this language.
Present law provides that after June 30, 2020, "child" means any person under the age of 21,
including an emancipated minor, who commits a delinquent act on or after July 1, 2020, and before
the person attains 18 years of age. 
Proposed law deletes this language and provides that after March 1, 2019, "child" means any person
under the age of 21, including an emancipated minor, who commits a delinquent act on or after
March 1, 2019, when the act is not a crime of violence as defined in R.S. 14:2 and occurs before the
person obtains eighteen years of age, provided that the office of juvenile justice certifies on or before
January 1, 2019, that there is adequate funding and resources available to accommodate the projected
increase in caseload.
Effective upon signature of the governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action.
(Amends Ch.C.Art. 804(1))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate
Committee Amendments Proposed by Senate Committee on Judiciary A to the original bill
1. Revises definition to provide language as of March 1, 2019.