Louisiana 2018 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB336 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    RÉSUMÉ DIGEST
ACT 380 (SB 336) 2018 Regular Session	Riser
Prior law provided that the La. Workforce Commission and all the statutory entities made
a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2018, and
that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2019, unless the
legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities
prior thereto.
New law provides for the general re-creation of the La. Workforce Commission and its
statutory entities, effective June 30, 2018, in accordance with the "sunset" law.  New law
supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for review and re-
creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the
department along with additional provisions.  
New law makes July 1, 2023, the new termination date and termination would begin July 1,
2022, unless the department is re-created again.
Prior law provided for the Incumbent Worker Training Program within the La. Workforce
Commission.  Prior law provided that the purpose of the program is to upgrade job skills
through training, with emphasis on preventing job loss caused by obsolete skills,
technological change, or national or global competition, in order to retain workers for
occupations in high demand areas of the economy.  
Prior law provided that, for the program to continue, reauthorization must be expressly
renewed by the legislature prior to July 1, 2018.
 
New law provides for the reauthorization of the incumbent worker training program within
the La. Workforce Commission until July 1, 2022. 
New law changes the names of the officers of the La. Workforce Commission as follows:
(1)Executive director to secretary.
(2)Deputy executive director to deputy secretary.
(3)Chief financial officer to undersecretary.
(4)Director to assistant secretary.
New law directs the La. State Law Institute to change the names of the officers throughout
the statutes as provided in new law.
Effective June 30, 2018.
(Amends R.S. 23:1(A) and (C)(3), 153, 382(A) and (B), 390(C) and (D), 1203.1(A)(intro
para), (1) - (4), and (6), (B)(intro para), (E), (F)(intro para), (1), (2)(intro para), (3), (5),
(G)(2) and (3), (H), and (J), 1203.1.1(A), and 1553(G), R.S. 36:3(2), (4), (6), (7), 8(E)(1),
301(C), 302, 303, 304(A)(intro para), (8), (9)(b), (B)(intro para), (1)(a)(i) and (ii), and 305-
307, R.S. 42:1266(C)(1)(e); adds R.S. 49:191(10)(c); repeals R.S. 36:8(E)(2)(j) and R.S. 
49:191(8)(a))