Louisiana 2018 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB62 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument, were prepared by Michelle Ridge.
DIGEST
SB 62 Engrossed	2018 Regular Session	Martiny
Present law requires, under the "Sunset" law, that the following agencies shall begin to terminate
their operations on July 1, 2018: 
(1)La. Board of Cosmetology.
(2)Office of Financial Institutions.
(3)La. State Racing Commission.
(4)La. Cemetery Board.
(5)State Board of Certified Public Accountants of La.
(6)State Board of Architectural Examiners.
(7)La. Real Estate Commission.
(8)La. State Board of Home Inspectors.
(9)State Licensing Board for Contractors.
(10)Board of Examiners of Certified Shorthand Reporters.
(11)La. Auctioneers Licensing Board.
(12)State Board of Examiners of Interior Designers.
(13)La. Real Estate Appraisers Board.
(14)State Boxing and Wrestling Commission.
(15)La. Motor Vehicle Commission.
(16)La. Used Motor Vehicle Commission.
(17)La. State Polygraph Board.
Present law provides that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2019, unless legislation is enacted that authorizes the re-creation of the agencies prior thereto. 
Proposed law provides for the re-creation of those agencies, effective June 30, 2018, in accordance
with the "Sunset" law.  Supersedes the provisions of the "Sunset" law which sets out the procedure
for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within
those agencies along with additional provisions. July 1, 2023, is the new termination date, and
termination will begin July 1, 2022, unless the agency is again re-created.
Effective June 30, 2018. 
(Adds R.S. 49:191(10)(c); repeals R.S. 49:191(8)(j))