Louisiana 2018 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB62 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    RÉSUMÉ DIGEST
ACT 350 (SB 62) 2018 Regular Session	Martiny
Prior law required, under the "Sunset" law, that the following agencies shall begin to
terminate their operations on July 1, 2018: 
(1)La. Board of Cosmetology.
(2)Office of Financial Institutions.
(3)La. State Racing Commission.
(4)La. Cemetery Board.
(5)State Board of Certified Public Accountants of La.
(6)State Board of Architectural Examiners.
(7)La. Real Estate Commission.
(8)La. State Board of Home Inspectors.
(9)State Licensing Board for Contractors.
(10)Board of Examiners of Certified Shorthand Reporters.
(11)La. Auctioneers Licensing Board.
(12)State Board of Examiners of Interior Designers.
(13)La. Real Estate Appraisers Board.
(14)State Boxing and Wrestling Commission.
(15)La. Motor Vehicle Commission.
(16)La. Used Motor Vehicle Commission.
(17)La. State Polygraph Board.
Prior law provided that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2019,
unless legislation is enacted that authorizes the re-creation of the agencies prior thereto. 
New law provides for the re-creation of those agencies, effective June 30, 2018, in
accordance with the "Sunset" law.  Supersedes the provisions of the "Sunset" law which sets
out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create
each statutory entity within those agencies along with additional provisions. July 1, 2023, is
the new termination date, and termination will begin July 1, 2022, unless the agency is again
re-created.
Effective June 30, 2018. 
(Adds R.S. 49:191(10)(c); repeals R.S. 49:191(8)(j))