Louisiana 2018 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB65 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument, were prepared by Leonore Heavey.
DIGEST
SB 65 Original	2018 Regular Session	Johns
Present law requires that applications for La. Quality Jobs Program incentives be filed no later than
24 months after the filing of the advance notification.
Proposed law retains present law. 
Present law provides an exception to the application filing requirement for projects for which an
advance notification form was filed on or after January 1, 2014, and before January 31, 2014, and
authorized applications for those projects to be filed any time prior to January 31, 2016.
Proposed law authorizes an exception to the application filing requirement for projects for which an
advance notification was filed on or after June 1, 2015, and before July 1, 2015, and requires
applications for those projects to be filed before January 1, 2018.
Effective July 1, 2018.
(Amends R.S. 51:2455(D)(3))