Louisiana 2018 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB65 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    The original instrument was prepared by Leonore F. Heavey. The following digest,
which does not constitute a part of the legislative instrument, was prepared by James
Benton.
DIGEST
SB 65 Engrossed	2018 Regular Session	Johns
Present law requires that applications for La. Quality Jobs Program incentives be filed no later than
24 months after the filing of the advance notification.
Proposed law retains present law. 
Present law provides an exception to the application filing requirement for projects for which an
advance notification form was filed on or after January 1, 2014, and before January 31, 2014, and
authorized applications for those projects to be filed any time prior to January 31, 2016.
Proposed law authorizes an exception to the application filing requirement for projects for which an
advance notification was filed on or after June 1, 2015, and before July 1, 2015, and requires
applications for those projects to be filed before January 1, 2018.
Effective upon signature of the governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action.
(Amends R.S. 51:2455(D)(3))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate
Committee Amendments Proposed by Senate Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs to
the original bill
1. Makes technical changes.
2. Changes effective date to governor's signature.