Louisiana 2019 2019 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB250 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    GREEN SHEET REDIGEST
HB 250	2019 Regular Session	Davis
HEALTH/BEHAVIORAL: Requires residential treatment facilities to provide access
to medication-assisted treatment for patients with opioid use disorder
DIGEST
Proposed law requires each residential treatment facility licensed pursuant to present law,
R.S. 40:2151 et seq., which provides treatment for opioid use disorder to provide all of the
following:
(1)Onsite access to at least one form of FDA-approved opioid antagonist treatment
either onsite or by referral.
(2)Onsite access to at least one form of FDA-approved partial opioid agonist treatment.
Proposed law requires each residential substance use disorder facility licensed pursuant to
present law which provides treatment for opioid use disorder to submit to the La. Department
of Health (LDH) on its initial licensing application or its annual licensing renewal application
an attestation as to whether it is complying with the requirements of proposed law. Provides
that the requirement for submission of the attestation shall commence on Jan. 1, 2021.
Provides further that if the licensed facility is not fully complying with the requirements of
proposed law, then its attestation shall include a report addressing its progress toward
satisfying those requirements.
Proposed law prohibits LDH from taking any action prior to Jan. 1, 2021, to enforce the
requirements of proposed law for residential substance use disorder facilities to submit
attestations to the department relative to their compliance with proposed law.
Effective Jan. 1, 2020.
(Amends R.S. 40:2156(B)(intro. para.) and (6); Adds R.S. 40:2153(15) and 2159.1)
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The House Floor Amendments to the engrossed bill:
1. Retain and relocate proposed law within present law.
2. Delete proposed law indicating that residential substance use disorder
facilities may meet opioid use disorder treatment requirements of proposed
law by providing access to opioid antagonist treatment by referral.
3. Require that each residential substance use disorder facility licensed pursuant
to present law as a behavioral health services provider which provides
treatment for opioid use disorder submit to the LDH on its initial licensing
application or its annual licensing renewal application an attestation as to
whether it is complying with the requirements of proposed law. Provide that
the requirement for submission of the attestation shall commence on Jan. 1,
2021. Provide further that if the licensed facility is not fully complying with
the requirements of proposed law, then its attestation shall include a report
addressing its progress toward satisfying those requirements.
4. Prohibit LDH from taking any action prior to Jan. 1, 2021, to enforce the
requirements of proposed law for residential substance use disorder facilities
to submit attestations to the department relative to their compliance with
proposed law.
Page 1 of 2
Prepared by Christine Arbo Peck. 5. Change the date on which LDH may begin taking actions against licensees
to enforce requirements of proposed law relative to the provision of opioid
agonist and antagonist treatment from Jan. 1, 2023, to Jan. 1, 2020.
6. Delete proposed law requiring the following:
(a)That LDH develop a monitoring mechanism to track and report on
which behavioral health services providers are complying with the
requirements of proposed law prior to commencement of enforcement
of proposed law.
(b)That LDH offer technical assistance to behavioral health services
providers seeking to comply with proposed law prior to
commencement of enforcement of proposed law.
(c)That each behavioral health services provider subject to the
requirements of proposed law furnish to LDH, on or before Jan. 1,
2021, a report addressing its progress toward satisfying proposed law.
Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate
Committee Amendments Proposed by Senate Committee on Health and Welfare to
the reengrossed bill
1. Provides that onsite access to at least one form of FDA-approved opioid
antagonist treatment may be either onsite or by referral.
2. Changes effective date for enforcement by the La. Department of Health from
January 1, 2020 to January 1, 2021.
Page 2 of 2
Prepared by Christine Arbo Peck.