Louisiana 2019 2019 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB387 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 19RS-917	REENGROSSED
2019 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 387
BY REPRESENTATIVES JEFFERSON AND JACKSON
Prefiled pursuant to Article III, Section 2(A)(4)(b)(i) of the Constitution of Louisiana.
DISTRICT ATTORNEYS:  Increases the salary of the district attorney
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 16:10(A) and 16:11(A)(1), relative to annual salary of district
3 attorneys payable by state; relative to annual salary of assistant district attorneys by
4 state; to provide for an increase in annual salary of district attorneys and assistant
5 district attorneys; and to provide for related matters.
6Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
7 Section 1.  R.S. 16:10(A) and 11(A)(1) are  hereby amended and reenacted to read
8as follows: 
9 §10.  Annual salary of district attorneys payable by state 
10	A.(1)  The annual salary of the several district attorneys throughout the state
11 of Louisiana is hereby fixed at fifty thousand dollars payable monthly by the state
12 treasurer upon the warrant of the district attorney.
13	(2)  Effective July 1, 2020, the annual salary of the several district attorneys
14 throughout the state of Louisiana is hereby fixed at fifty-two thousand five hundred
15 dollars payable monthly by the state treasurer upon the warrant of the district
16 attorney.  Effective July 1, 2021, the annual salary of the several district attorneys
17 throughout the state of Louisiana is hereby fixed at fifty-five thousand dollars
18 payable monthly by the state treasurer upon the warrant of the district attorney.
19	*          *          *
Page 1 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 19RS-917	REENGROSSED
HB NO. 387
1 §11.  Annual salary of assistant district attorneys payable by state
2	A.(1)  Except as provided in Paragraph (2) of this Subsection, effective July
3 1, 2006, the annual salary of each of the several assistant district attorneys
4 throughout the state of Louisiana, including the parish of Orleans, is hereby fixed at 
5 thirty-five thousand dollars payable monthly by the state treasurer upon the warrant
6 of each of the assistant district attorneys.  Effective July 1, 2007, the annual salary
7 of each of the several assistant district attorneys, throughout the state of Louisiana,
8 including the parish of Orleans, is hereby fixed at forty thousand dollars payable
9 monthly by the state treasurer upon the warrant of each of the assistant district
10 attorneys.  Effective July 1, 2008, the annual salary of each of the several assistant
11 district attorneys, throughout the state of Louisiana, including the parish of Orleans,
12 is hereby fixed at forty-five thousand dollars payable monthly by the state treasurer
13 upon the warrant of each of the assistant district attorneys.  Effective July 1, 2020,
14 the annual salary of each of the several assistant district attorneys throughout the
15 state of Louisiana, including the parish of Orleans, is hereby fixed at forty-seven
16 thousand five hundred dollars payable monthly by the state treasurer upon the
17 warrant of each of the assistant district attorneys.  Effective July 1, 2021, the annual
18 salary of each of the several assistant district attorneys throughout the state of
19 Louisiana, including the parish of Orleans, is hereby fixed at fifty thousand dollars
20 payable monthly by the state treasurer upon the warrant of each of the assistant
21 district attorneys.  Any increase in salary shall be subject to an appropriation for that
22 purpose.
23	*          *          *
24 Section 2.  This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2019.
Page 2 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 19RS-917	REENGROSSED
HB NO. 387
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 387 Reengrossed 2019 Regular Session	Jefferson
Abstract:  Increases the salary of district attorneys from $50,000 to $52,500 beginning July
1, 2020, and to $55,000 beginning July 1, 2021.  Further, increases the salary of
assistant district attorneys from $45,000 to $47,500 beginning July 1, 2020, and to
$50,000 beginning July 1, 2021.
Present law provides that district attorneys statewide are to receive an annual salary of
$50,000 payable monthly.
 
Present law provides that, effective July 1, 2008, assistant district attorneys statewide are to
receive an annual salary of $45,000 payable monthly.
Proposed law increases the salary of the district attorney to $52,500 beginning July 1, 2020,
and to $55,000 beginning July 1, 2021.
Proposed law increases the salary of the assistant district attorneys to $47,500 beginning July
1, 2020, and to $50,000 beginning July 1, 2021.
Effective July 1, 2019.
(Amends R.S. 16:10(A) and 16:11(A)(1))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Judiciary to the original
bill:
1. Increase the district attorney's salary to $52,500 beginning July 1, 2020, and to
$55,000 beginning July 1, 2022.
2. Increase the assistant district attorney's salary to $47,500 beginning July 1, 2020,
and to $50,000 beginning July 1, 2021.
The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Appropriations to the
engrossed bill:
1. Change the effective date to increase the district attorney's salary to $55,000
from July 1, 2022, to July 1, 2021.
Page 3 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.