Louisiana 2019 2019 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB387 Enrolled / Bill

                    ENROLLED
2019 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 387
BY REPRESENTATIVES JEFFERSON, JACKSON, ADAMS, AMEDEE, BAGLEY,
BAGNERIS, BARRAS, TERRY BROWN, CHANEY, COUSSAN, COX,
DUBUISSON, DWIGHT, HOFFMANN, HORTON, JENKINS, JORDAN, LYONS,
MARINO, MCFARLAND, MOORE, MUSCARELLO, NORTON, PIERRE,
PYLANT, TALBOT, THOMAS, WHITE, AND ZERINGUE AND SENATORS
ALARIO, APPEL, BARROW, BOUDREAUX, COLOMB, DONAHUE, ERDEY,
GATTI, HENSGENS, HEWITT, JOHNS, LAMBERT, LONG, LUNEAU,
MARTINY, MORRELL, PRICE, GARY SMITH, JOHN SMITH, WALSWORTH,
WARD, AND WHITE
1	AN ACT
2 To amend and reenact R.S. 16:10(A) and 16:11(A)(1), relative to annual salary of district
3 attorneys payable by state; relative to annual salary of assistant district attorneys by
4 state; to provide for an increase in annual salary of district attorneys and assistant
5 district attorneys; and to provide for related matters.
6 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
7 Section 1.  R.S. 16:10(A) and 11(A)(1) are  hereby amended and reenacted to read
8 as follows: 
9 §10.  Annual salary of district attorneys payable by state 
10	A.(1)  The annual salary of the several district attorneys throughout the state
11 of Louisiana is hereby fixed at fifty thousand dollars payable monthly by the state
12 treasurer upon the warrant of the district attorney.
13	(2)  Effective July 1, 2020, the annual salary of the several district attorneys
14 throughout the state of Louisiana is hereby fixed at fifty-two thousand five hundred
15 dollars payable monthly by the state treasurer upon the warrant of the district
16 attorney.  Effective July 1, 2021, the annual salary of the several district attorneys
17 throughout the state of Louisiana is hereby fixed at fifty-five thousand dollars
18 payable monthly by the state treasurer upon the warrant of the district attorney.
19	*          *          *
20 §11.  Annual salary of assistant district attorneys payable by state
21	A.(1)  Except as provided in Paragraph (2) of this Subsection, effective July
22 1, 2006, the annual salary of each of the several assistant district attorneys
Page 1 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HB NO. 387	ENROLLED
1 throughout the state of Louisiana, including the parish of Orleans, is hereby fixed at 
2 thirty-five thousand dollars payable monthly by the state treasurer upon the warrant
3 of each of the assistant district attorneys.  Effective July 1, 2007, the annual salary
4 of each of the several assistant district attorneys, throughout the state of Louisiana,
5 including the parish of Orleans, is hereby fixed at forty thousand dollars payable
6 monthly by the state treasurer upon the warrant of each of the assistant district
7 attorneys.  Effective July 1, 2008, the annual salary of each of the several assistant
8 district attorneys, throughout the state of Louisiana, including the parish of Orleans,
9 is hereby fixed at forty-five thousand dollars payable monthly by the state treasurer
10 upon the warrant of each of the assistant district attorneys.  Effective July 1, 2020,
11 the annual salary of each of the several assistant district attorneys throughout the
12 state of Louisiana, including the parish of Orleans, is hereby fixed at forty-seven
13 thousand five hundred dollars payable monthly by the state treasurer upon the
14 warrant of each of the assistant district attorneys.  Effective July 1, 2021, the annual
15 salary of each of the several assistant district attorneys throughout the state of
16 Louisiana, including the parish of Orleans, is hereby fixed at fifty thousand dollars
17 payable monthly by the state treasurer upon the warrant of each of the assistant
18 district attorneys.  Any increase in salary shall be subject to an appropriation for that
19 purpose.
20	*          *          *
21 Section 2.  This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2019.
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF LOUISIANA
APPROVED:  
Page 2 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.