ENROLLED 2019 Regular Session HOUSE BILL NO. 387 BY REPRESENTATIVES JEFFERSON, JACKSON, ADAMS, AMEDEE, BAGLEY, BAGNERIS, BARRAS, TERRY BROWN, CHANEY, COUSSAN, COX, DUBUISSON, DWIGHT, HOFFMANN, HORTON, JENKINS, JORDAN, LYONS, MARINO, MCFARLAND, MOORE, MUSCARELLO, NORTON, PIERRE, PYLANT, TALBOT, THOMAS, WHITE, AND ZERINGUE AND SENATORS ALARIO, APPEL, BARROW, BOUDREAUX, COLOMB, DONAHUE, ERDEY, GATTI, HENSGENS, HEWITT, JOHNS, LAMBERT, LONG, LUNEAU, MARTINY, MORRELL, PRICE, GARY SMITH, JOHN SMITH, WALSWORTH, WARD, AND WHITE 1 AN ACT 2 To amend and reenact R.S. 16:10(A) and 16:11(A)(1), relative to annual salary of district 3 attorneys payable by state; relative to annual salary of assistant district attorneys by 4 state; to provide for an increase in annual salary of district attorneys and assistant 5 district attorneys; and to provide for related matters. 6 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 7 Section 1. R.S. 16:10(A) and 11(A)(1) are hereby amended and reenacted to read 8 as follows: 9 §10. Annual salary of district attorneys payable by state 10 A.(1) The annual salary of the several district attorneys throughout the state 11 of Louisiana is hereby fixed at fifty thousand dollars payable monthly by the state 12 treasurer upon the warrant of the district attorney. 13 (2) Effective July 1, 2020, the annual salary of the several district attorneys 14 throughout the state of Louisiana is hereby fixed at fifty-two thousand five hundred 15 dollars payable monthly by the state treasurer upon the warrant of the district 16 attorney. Effective July 1, 2021, the annual salary of the several district attorneys 17 throughout the state of Louisiana is hereby fixed at fifty-five thousand dollars 18 payable monthly by the state treasurer upon the warrant of the district attorney. 19 * * * 20 §11. Annual salary of assistant district attorneys payable by state 21 A.(1) Except as provided in Paragraph (2) of this Subsection, effective July 22 1, 2006, the annual salary of each of the several assistant district attorneys Page 1 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HB NO. 387 ENROLLED 1 throughout the state of Louisiana, including the parish of Orleans, is hereby fixed at 2 thirty-five thousand dollars payable monthly by the state treasurer upon the warrant 3 of each of the assistant district attorneys. Effective July 1, 2007, the annual salary 4 of each of the several assistant district attorneys, throughout the state of Louisiana, 5 including the parish of Orleans, is hereby fixed at forty thousand dollars payable 6 monthly by the state treasurer upon the warrant of each of the assistant district 7 attorneys. Effective July 1, 2008, the annual salary of each of the several assistant 8 district attorneys, throughout the state of Louisiana, including the parish of Orleans, 9 is hereby fixed at forty-five thousand dollars payable monthly by the state treasurer 10 upon the warrant of each of the assistant district attorneys. Effective July 1, 2020, 11 the annual salary of each of the several assistant district attorneys throughout the 12 state of Louisiana, including the parish of Orleans, is hereby fixed at forty-seven 13 thousand five hundred dollars payable monthly by the state treasurer upon the 14 warrant of each of the assistant district attorneys. Effective July 1, 2021, the annual 15 salary of each of the several assistant district attorneys throughout the state of 16 Louisiana, including the parish of Orleans, is hereby fixed at fifty thousand dollars 17 payable monthly by the state treasurer upon the warrant of each of the assistant 18 district attorneys. Any increase in salary shall be subject to an appropriation for that 19 purpose. 20 * * * 21 Section 2. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2019. SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF LOUISIANA APPROVED: Page 2 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions.