DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 387 Engrossed 2019 Regular Session Jefferson Abstract: Increases the salary of district attorneys and assistant district attorneys statewide. Present law provides that district attorneys statewide are to receive an annual salary of $50,000 payable monthly. Present law provides that, effective July 1, 2008, assistant district attorneys statewide are to receive an annual salary of $45,000 payable monthly. Proposed law increases the salary of the district attorney to $52,500 beginning July 1, 2020, and to $55,000 beginning July 1, 2022. Proposed law increases the salary of the assistant district attorneys to $47,500 beginning July 1, 2020, and to $50,000 beginning July 1, 2021. Effective July 1, 2019. (Amends R.S. 16:10(A) and 16:11(A)(1)) Summary of Amendments Adopted by House The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Judiciary to the original bill: 1. Increase the district attorney's salary to $52,500 beginning July 1, 2020, and to $55,000 beginning July 1, 2022. 2. Increase the assistant district attorney's salary to $47,500 beginning July 1, 2020, and to $50,000 beginning July 1, 2021.