Louisiana 2019 2019 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB387 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law
or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 387 Reengrossed 2019 Regular Session	Jefferson
Abstract:  Increases the salary of district attorneys from $50,000 to $52,500 beginning July 1, 2020,
and to $55,000 beginning July 1, 2021.  Further, increases the salary of assistant district
attorneys from $45,000 to $47,500 beginning July 1, 2020, and to $50,000 beginning July
1, 2021.
Present law provides that district attorneys statewide are to receive an annual salary of $50,000
payable monthly.
 
Present law provides that, effective July 1, 2008, assistant district attorneys statewide are to receive
an annual salary of $45,000 payable monthly.
Proposed law increases the salary of the district attorney to $52,500 beginning July 1, 2020, and to
$55,000 beginning July 1, 2021.
Proposed law increases the salary of the assistant district attorneys to $47,500 beginning July 1,
2020, and to $50,000 beginning July 1, 2021.
Effective July 1, 2019.
(Amends R.S. 16:10(A) and 16:11(A)(1))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Judiciary to the original bill:
1. Increase the district attorney's salary to $52,500 beginning July 1, 2020, and to $55,000
beginning July 1, 2022.
2. Increase the assistant district attorney's salary to $47,500 beginning July 1, 2020, and to
$50,000 beginning July 1, 2021.
The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Appropriations to the engrossed
bill:
1. Change the effective date to increase the district attorney's salary to $55,000 from July
1, 2022, to July 1, 2021.