HLS 19RS-855 ORIGINAL 2019 Regular Session HOUSE BILL NO. 480 BY REPRESENTATIVE DAVIS TAX CREDITS: Increases the amount of the research and development tax credit, authorizes transferability and a state buy-back on the credit, and extends the sunset provision 1 AN ACT 2To amend and reenact R.S. 47:6015(C)(2)(c), (D), and (J), relative to income and franchise 3 tax credits; to provide with respect to the research and development tax credit; to 4 provide for the amount of the credit; to authorize the transferability of the tax credit 5 under certain circumstances; to provide for applicability; to provide for an effective 6 date; and to provide for related matters. 7Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 8 Section 1. R.S. 47:6015(C)(2)(c), (D), and (J) are hereby amended and reenacted to 9read as follows: 10 ยง6015. Research and development tax credit 11 * * * 12 C. 13 * * * 14 (2) The amount of the credit authorized in this Section shall be equal to 15 either: 16 * * * 17 (c) Thirty Forty percent of the difference, if any, of the Louisiana qualified 18 research expenses for the taxable year minus the base amount, if the taxpayer is an 19 entity that employs less than fifty persons. 20 * * * Page 1 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 19RS-855 ORIGINAL HB NO. 480 1 D.(1) A taxpayer who receives a Phase I or II grant from the federal Small 2 Business Technology Transfer Program or a federal Small Business Innovation 3 Research Grant as created by the Small Business Innovation Development Act of 4 1982 (P.L. 97-219), reauthorized by the Small Business Research and Development 5 Enhancement Act (P.L. 102-564), and reauthorized again by the Small Business 6 Reauthorization Act of 2000 (P.L. 106-554) shall be allowed a tax credit in an 7 amount equal to thirty forty percent of the award received during the tax year. 8 (2)(a) In addition to the credit utilization allowed by Paragraph (C)(3) of this 9 Section, research and development tax credits for tax years 2018 and later that are 10 based on participation in the Small Business Technology Transfer Program or the 11 Small Business Innovation Research Grant program and that were not previously 12 claimed by any taxpayer against his income or corporation franchise tax may be 13 transferred or sold to another Louisiana taxpayer, subject to the following conditions: 14 (a)(i) A single transfer or sale may involve one or more transferees. A 15 transferee of the tax credits may transfer or sell such tax credits subject to the 16 conditions of this Paragraph. 17 (b)(ii) Transferors and transferees shall submit to the Department of Revenue 18 in writing, a notification of any transfer or sale of tax credits within ten business days 19 after the transfer or sale of such tax credits. No transfer or sale of tax credits shall 20 be effective until recorded in the tax credit registry in accordance with R.S. 47:1524. 21 The notification shall include the transferor's tax credit balance prior to transfer, a 22 copy of any tax credit certification letter issued by the Department of Economic 23 Development, the transferor's remaining tax credit balance after transfer, all tax 24 identification numbers for both transferor and transferee, the date of the transfer, the 25 amount transferred, a copy of the credit certificate, the price paid by the transferee 26 to the transferor, and any other information required by the Department of Revenue. 27 The notification submitted to the Department of Revenue shall include a transfer 28 processing fee of two hundred dollars per transferee. Page 2 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 19RS-855 ORIGINAL HB NO. 480 1 (c)(iii) Failure to comply with this Paragraph shall result in the disallowance 2 of the tax credit until the taxpayers are in full compliance. 3 (d)(iv) The transfer or sale of this credit does not extend the time in which 4 the credit can be used. The carryforward period for a credit that is transferred or sold 5 begins on the date on which the credit was earned. 6 (b) Beginning January 1, 2020, the provisions of this Paragraph shall also be 7 applicable to the credit utilization allowed by Paragraph (B)(2) of this Section, 8 * * * 9 J. No credit shall be allowed pursuant to this Section for research 10 expenditures incurred, Small Business Technology Transfer Program funds received 11 or Small Business Innovation Research Grant funds received after December 31, 12 2021 December 31, 2023. 13 * * * 14 Section 2. The provisions of this Act shall apply to tax years beginning on and after 15January 1, 2020. 16 Section 3. This Act shall become effective on January 1, 2020. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 480 Original 2019 Regular Session Davis Abstract: Extends the research and development tax credit program for two years, increases the amount of the tax credit from 30% to 40%, and authorizes for transferability and a state direct buy-back of the credit. Present law authorizes an income and corporation franchise tax credit for certain taxpayers who employ 50 or more persons and claim a federal income tax credit for increasing research activities. This tax credit is also available for tax payers who employ fewer than 50 employees if the employer meets certain eligibility requirements. Present law authorizes the following credits as a percentage of increased research expenses for a taxpayer who employs the following number of employees: Page 3 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 19RS-855 ORIGINAL HB NO. 480 Number of EmployeesTax Credit 100 or more 5% 50-99 10% fewer than 50 30% Proposed law changes present law by increasing the the amount of the percentage for a taxpayer who employs fewer than 50 employees from 30% to 40%. Present law allows a taxpayer receiving a federal Small Business Innovation Research Grant a tax credit in an amount equal to 30% of the award received during the tax year. Proposed law increases the tax credit from 30% to 40% of the award received during the tax year. Present law authorizes credits based upon participation in the Small Business Innovation Research Grant program to be transferred or sold to one or more La. taxpayers. To utilize the transferred tax credit, present law requires transferors and transferees to submit to the Dept. of Revenue written notification of any transfer or sale of this tax credit within 10 business days after the transfer or sale. Proposed law retains present law but extends authorization to transfer tax credits to employers who employ fewer than 50 persons and meet other eligibility requirements. Present law authorizes a carryforward period of the credit beginning on the date on which the credit was earned, regardless of when the credit was transferred or sold. Present law prohibits the payment of credits for research expenditures incurred, Small Business Technology Transfer Program funds received or Small Business Innovation Research Grant funds received after Dec. 31, 2021. Proposed law extends the sunset of the program from Dec. 31, 2021 to Dec. 31, 2023. Effective Jan. 1, 2020, and applicable to tax years beginning on and after Jan. 1, 2020. (Amends R.S. 47:6015(C)(2)(c), (D), and (J)) Page 4 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions.