Louisiana 2019 2019 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB480 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 19RS-855	ENGROSSED
2019 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 480
BY REPRESENTATIVE DAVIS
TAX CREDITS:  Extends the sunset of the research and development tax credit
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 47:6015(J), relative to income and franchise tax credits; to
3 extend the duration of the tax credit; to provide for an effective date; and to provide
4 for related matters.
5Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
6 Section 1.  R.S. 47:6015(J) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows:
7 ยง6015.  Research and development tax credit
8	*          *          *
9	J.  No credit shall be allowed pursuant to this Section for research
10 expenditures incurred, Small Business Technology Transfer Program funds received
11 or Small Business Innovation Research Grant funds received after December 31,
12 2021 December 31, 2025.
13	*          *          *
14	Section 2.  This Act shall become effective on January 1, 2020.
Page 1 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 19RS-855	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 480
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 480 Engrossed 2019 Regular Session	Davis
Abstract:  Extends the research and development tax credit program from Dec. 31, 2021 to
Dec. 31, 2025.
Present law authorizes an income and corporation franchise tax credit for certain taxpayers 
who employ 50 or more persons and claim a federal income tax credit for increasing
research activities.  This tax credit is also available for tax payers who employ fewer than
50 employees if the employer meets certain eligibility requirements.
Present law authorizes the following credits as a percentage of increased research expenses
for a taxpayer who employs the following number of employees:
Number of EmployeesTax Credit
100 or more 5%
50-99	10%
fewer than 50 30%
Present law prohibits the payment of credits for research expenditures incurred, Small
Business Technology Transfer Program funds received or Small Business Innovation
Research Grant funds received after Dec. 31, 2021.
Proposed law extends the sunset of the program from Dec. 31, 2021 to Dec. 31, 2025.
Effective Jan. 1, 2020. 
(Amends R.S. 47:6015(J))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Ways and Means to the
original bill:
1. Extend the duration of the tax credit program from Dec. 31. 2023 to Dec. 31,
2025.
2. Delete proposed law provisions to increase the amount of the percentage of the
tax credit for a taxpayer who employs fewer than 50 employees. 
3. Delete proposed law provisions to increase the amount of the Small Business
Innovation Research Grant tax credit.
4. Delete proposed law authorization to extend the transfer of the tax credit to
employers who employ fewer than 50 persons and meet other eligibility
requirements.
Page 2 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.