Louisiana 2019 2019 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB83 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 19RS-312	ORIGINAL
2019 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 83
BY REPRESENTATIVE JIMMY HARRIS
TAX CREDITS:  Extends the sunset of the tax credit for rehabilitation of historic structures
to January 1, 2026
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 47:6019(A)(1)(a) and (C), relative to tax credits; to provide for
3 the tax credit for the rehabilitation of historic structures for nonresidential property;
4 to extend the sunset of the tax credit; to provide for an effective date; and to provide
5 for related matters.
6Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
7 Section 1.  R.S. 47:6019(A)(1)(a) and (C) are hereby amended and reenacted to read
8as follows: 
9 ยง6019.  Tax credit; rehabilitation of historic structures
10	A.(1)(a)  There shall be a credit against income and corporation franchise tax
11 for the amount of eligible costs and expenses incurred during the rehabilitation of a
12 historic structure located in a downtown development or a cultural district.  The
13 amount of the credit shall equal twenty-five percent of the eligible costs and
14 expenses of the rehabilitation incurred prior to January 1, 2018, regardless of the
15 year in which the property is placed in service.  The amount of the credit shall equal
16 twenty percent of the eligible costs and expenses of the rehabilitation incurred on or
17 after January 1, 2018, and before January 1, 2022,  January 1, 2026, regardless of the
18 year in which the property is placed in service.  No credit is authorized pursuant to
19 this Section for expenses incurred on or after January 1, 2022. January 1, 2026.
20	*          *          *
Page 1 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 19RS-312	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 83
1	C.  The provisions of this Section shall be effective for the taxable years
2 ending prior to January 1, 2022. January 1, 2026.
3 Section 2. This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not
4signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature
5by the governor, as provided by Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana.  If
6vetoed by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become
7effective on the day following such approval.
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 83 Original 2019 Regular Session	Jimmy Harris
Abstract:  Extends the sunset for the tax credit for the rehabilitation of nonresidential
historic structures from Jan. 1, 2022 to Jan. 1, 2026. 
Present law authorizes an income or corporation franchise tax credit for the amount of
eligible costs and expense incurred during the rehabilitation of a historic structure located
in a downtown development district or cultural district. 
Present law provides that the amount of the credit shall equal 25% of eligible costs and
expenses incurred prior to Jan. 1, 2018, and the amount of the credit shall equal 20% of
eligible costs and expenses incurred on or after Jan. 1, 2018, but before Jan. 1, 2022.  No
credit is authorized for expenses incurred on or after Jan. 1, 2022. 
Proposed law retains present law as it pertains to the amount of the credit but extends the
eligibility date of expenses from before Jan. 1, 2022, to Jan. 1, 2026, and extends the sunset
date of the program from taxable years ending prior to Jan. 1, 2022, to taxable years ending
prior to Jan. 1, 2026.  
Effective upon the signature of the governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action.
(Amends R.S. 47:6019(A)(1)(a) and (C))
Page 2 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.