Louisiana 2019 2019 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR18 Enrolled / Bill

                    2019 Regular Session	ENROLLED
SENATE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 18
BY SENATOR MORRELL 
A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION
To provide relative to the Task Force on Secure Care Standards and Auditing to assist in
development and implementation of standards and procedures in the operation and
audit of secure care facilities in the state.
WHEREAS, Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 38 of the 2017 Regular Session of
the Legislature created the Task Force on Secure Care Standards and Auditing and provided
that it be abolished on February 1, 2019; and
WHEREAS, youth who have been adjudicated delinquent and youth determined to
be a risk to public safety or are unable to be treated in less restrictive settings are placed in
secure care facilities for treatment and rehabilitation; and
WHEREAS, secure care facilities provide a range of moderate to high security levels
with staff supervision designed to restrict resident activities with twenty-four hour control
over one's ability to enter and leave the facility; and
WHEREAS, four secure care facilities currently operate in the state – Swanson
Center for Youth in Monroe, Swanson Center for Youth in Columbia, Bridge City Center
for Youth, and Ware Youth Center Intensive Residential Program, and a fifth facility is
under construction in Bunkie; and
WHEREAS, in 2018 a comprehensive audit conducted by the Legislative Auditor
determined that the office of juvenile justice failed to conduct quality assurance audits of
secure care facilities from 2010 to 2015 and that the office failed to timely correct 51.9% and
49.1% of safety-related items identified in quality assurance audits conducted for 2016 and
2017, respectively; and
WHEREAS, prior to February 1, 2019, the office of juvenile justice was
promulgating recommendations of the Task Force on Secure Care Standards and Auditing
to provide standards in line with nationally recognized and accepted best practice standards
for care, treatment, and rehabilitation of youth in secure care facilities; and
WHEREAS, to continue providing technical assistance relative to recommendations
Page 1 of 4 SCR NO. 18	ENROLLED
and potential legislation as made by the task force created by SCR 38 of the 2017 Regular
Session, a new Task Force on Secure Care Standards and Auditing should be created and
comprised of the same members as the task force created pursuant to SCR 38 of the 2017
Regular Session.
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby
create the Task Force on Secure Standards and Auditing comprised of the same following
members as that task force created pursuant to SCR 38 of the 2017 Regular Session:
(1) The deputy secretary of the office of juvenile justice, or his designee.
(2) The president of the Louisiana Juvenile Detention Association, or his designee.
(3) The director of the Louisiana Center for Children's Rights, or his designee.
(4) The secretary of the Department of Children and Family Services, or her
designee.
(5) The secretary of the Louisiana Department of Health, or her designee.
(6) The executive director of the Advocacy Center of Louisiana, or his designee.
(7) The statewide director of the Juvenile Detention Alternatives Initiatives, or his
designee.
(8) An expert in assessing conditions of confinement in juvenile facilities for the
purpose of ensuring the safety and well-being of youth and the effect of incarceration on
adolescents and young adults, appointed by the chairman of the task force.
(9) An attorney with experience representing children, appointed by the director of
the Mental Health Advocacy Service.
(10) The executive director of Justice for Families, or her designee.
(11) The executive director of Families and Friends of Louisiana's Incarcerated
Children, or her designee.
(12) Two people formerly incarcerated in a Louisiana secure care facility, appointed
by the Louisiana Youth Justice Coalition.
(13) Two parents of children currently or formerly incarcerated in a Louisiana secure
care facility, appointed by the executive director of Justice for Families.
(14) Two people working as juvenile justice specialists in secure care facilities,
appointed by the office of juvenile justice.
Page 2 of 4 SCR NO. 18	ENROLLED
(15) The senior supervising attorney for the Louisiana Southern Poverty Law Center,
or her designee.
(16) The Louisiana Legislative Auditor, or his designee.
(17) The president of the Senate, or his designee.
(18) The speaker of the House of Representatives, or his designee.
(19) The governor, or his designee.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that task force members shall serve without
compensation or reimbursement of expenses, other than what may be afforded by their
appointing authority; legislative members of the task force shall receive the same per diem
and reimbursement of travel expenses as provided for attendance at legislative committee
meetings under the rules of the respective house in which they serve.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a majority of the membership of the task force
constitutes a quorum and that if all task force members have not been appointed by
September 1, 2019, a majority of the appointed membership shall constitute a quorum.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the task force may oversee implementation of
recommendations concerning standards and audits of secure care facilities, including but not
limited to:
(1) Recommendations to support imposition of standards and estimated costs
incurred by the office of juvenile justice.
(2) The implementation of prior recommendations made by the task force.
(3) The appropriation of funds may be required to implement recommendations.
(4) Legislation needed to support and provide for task force recommendations,
including the creation of an auditing process and necessary statutory changes to improve the
functions and activities of the Juvenile Justice Reform Act Implementation Committee.
(5) The discontinuation of the user-pay telephone system.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that standards and recommendations promulgated
by the office of juvenile justice apply to all secure care facilities and placements including
at Swanson Center for Youth in Monroe, Swanson Center for Youth in Columbia, Bridge
City Center for Youth, the Ware Youth Center Intensive Residential Program, and any future
secure care facilities or placements for youth in the custody of the office of juvenile justice.
Page 3 of 4 SCR NO. 18	ENROLLED
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the task force shall elect a chairman from its
membership. 
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the office of juvenile justice and all contracting
facilities and agencies shall cooperate and provide such information and assistance as may
be necessary to accomplish the goals and objectives of the task force and that the task force
may seek administrative assistance and staff support from the Louisiana Youth Justice
Coalition as may be necessary.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that no later than September 1, 2019, the office of
juvenile justice shall produce an estimate of the cost to implement the standards
recommended by the task force.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that no later than November 15, 2019, the task force
shall prepare and deliver a written report of its findings and recommendations to the
governor, the legislature, the office of juvenile justice, and the Legislative Auditor which
report shall include any proposed legislation and the establishment of a schedule and process
for conducting regular audits of secure care facilities.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that no later than November 15, 2020, the task force
shall prepare a written report of its findings and recommendations, including a status report
on the implementation of the standards and an ongoing auditing process to the governor,
legislature, the office of juvenile justice, and the Legislative Auditor.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Task Force on Secure Care Standards and
Auditing shall be abolished on June 30, 2021.
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Page 4 of 4