RÉSUMÉ DIGEST SCR 18 2019 Regular Session Morrell Creates the Task Force on Secure Care Standards and Auditing comprised of the same membership as the Task Force on Secure Care Standards and Auditing created under SCR 38 of the 2017 RS and abolished on February 1, 2019. Provides that the task force have the same membership as originally provided in SCR 38. Provides that the task force is to assist in development and implementation of standards and procedures in the operation and audit of secure care facilities in the state and authorizes and directs the task force to oversee implementation of the original recommendations relative to standards and audits of secure care facilities and the following: (1)Recommendations to support imposition of standards and estimated costs incurred by the office of juvenile justice. (2)The implementation of prior recommendations made by the task force. (3)The appropriation of funds may be required to implement recommendations. (4)Legislation needed to support and provide for task force recommendations, including the creation of an auditing process and necessary statutory changes to improve the functions and activities of the Juvenile Justice Reform Act Implementation Committee. (5)The discontinuation of the user-pay telephone system. Provides for administrative assistance and staff support from the Louisiana Youth Justice Coalition. Provides that the office of juvenile justice produce an estimate of the costs to implement the task force recommendations no later than September 1, 2019. Provides that the task force provide a written report to the governor, the legislature, the office of juvenile justice, and the legislative auditor no later than November 15, 2019, and another written report no later than November 15, 2020, of its findings and recommendations, including a status report on the implementation of the standards and an ongoing auditing process. Provides that the Task Force on Secure Care Standards and Auditing is abolished on June 30, 2021.