Louisiana 2019 2019 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR18 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    RÉSUMÉ DIGEST
SCR 18	2019 Regular Session	Morrell
Creates the Task Force on Secure Care Standards and Auditing comprised of the same
membership as the Task Force on Secure Care Standards and Auditing created under SCR 38
of the 2017 RS and abolished on February 1, 2019. Provides that the task force have the same
membership as originally provided in SCR 38.
Provides that the task force is to assist in development and implementation of standards and
procedures in the operation and audit of secure care facilities in the state and authorizes and
directs the task force to oversee implementation of the original recommendations relative to
standards and audits of secure care facilities and the following:
(1)Recommendations to support imposition of standards and estimated costs incurred
by the office of juvenile justice.
(2)The implementation of prior recommendations made by the task force.
(3)The appropriation of funds may be required to implement recommendations.
(4)Legislation needed to support and provide for task force recommendations, including
the creation of an auditing process and necessary statutory changes to improve the
functions and activities of the Juvenile Justice Reform Act Implementation
Committee.
(5)The discontinuation of the user-pay telephone system.
Provides for administrative assistance and staff support from the Louisiana Youth Justice
Coalition.
Provides that the office of juvenile justice produce an estimate of the costs to implement the
task force recommendations no later than September 1, 2019.
Provides that the task force provide a written report to the governor, the legislature, the office
of juvenile justice, and the legislative auditor no later than November 15, 2019, and another
written report no later than November 15, 2020, of its findings and recommendations,
including a status report on the implementation of the standards and an ongoing auditing
process.
Provides that the Task Force on Secure Care Standards and Auditing is abolished on
June 30, 2021.