2019 Regular Session ENROLLED SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 122 BY SENATORS TARVER AND PEACOCK A RESOLUTION To commend Carl E. Stewart on the end of his outstanding term as Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit and his return to active duty on the bench. WHEREAS, Carl Stewart was born to Corine and Richard Stewart, a postal worker, on January 2, 1950, in Shreveport, Louisiana; and WHEREAS, growing up in the southern United States, he was inspired by both the dedication of those involved in the civil rights movement and by the ability of the courts and attorneys to often right the wrongs of society and to bring about a measure of justice; and WHEREAS, Carl Stewart sought to be an agent for social change, he was diligent in his academic studies, and began to fulfill his goal of becoming an attorney when he entered Dillard University in New Orleans, earning a Bachelor of Arts degree, with honors, magna cum laude; and WHEREAS, he earned his Juris Doctor from Loyola University New Orleans College of Law in 1974 and began his practice of the law that same year as a captain in the Judge Advocate General Corps of the United States Army serving as defense attorney for soldiers facing charges at Fort Sam Houston, Texas; and WHEREAS, following his honorable discharge from the Army, Carl Stewart became an associate at a small private law firm and in 1978 he joined a field office under Louisiana Attorney General, William J. Guste; and WHEREAS, in 1979, he became an assistant United States attorney and worked on a variety of cases, including the successful prosecution of a loan shark who preyed on the poor, a sheriff who paid for votes in a reelection run, and an unscrupulous land owner who filed false flood relief claims and Carl Stewart was awarded a letter of commendation from the United States Justice Department for his work on civil rights cases in 1982 and 1983; and WHEREAS, he left the Justice Department in 1983 and returned to Shreveport to a private practice and an adjunct professorship at Louisiana State University in Shreveport and Page 1 of 3 SR NO. 122 ENROLLED in 1984 he was elected to a six-year term as a First Judicial District judge for Caddo Parish; and WHEREAS, in Judge Stewart's career in the judiciary, at both the state and national level, he has been lauded by attorneys who came before him, earning admiration for his "fine judicial manner, (that he) is careful to treat all parties with the same attitude and concern", and as "a splendid judge, excellent in every respect"; and WHEREAS, on January 27, 1994, President Bill Clinton nominated Judge Stewart to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, which is located in New Orleans, Louisiana, and on May 6, 1994 he was confirmed by the United States Senate and he received his commission on May 9, 1994; and WHEREAS, Judge Stewart became Chief Judge in 2012 and will end his term in that capacity on September 30, 2019, and return to active status on the bench on October 1, 2019; and WHEREAS, Judge Carl Stewart has been active in an array of professional organizations during his career, but it is in his commitment to his community and its people that his greatest accomplishments, aside from his inspiring work as a federal judge, should be noted, including, working to make a better community through Centenary College of Louisiana Board of Trustees, LSU in Shreveport Chancellor's Advisory Committee, as president of the Community Foundation of Shreveport-Bossier, and as an active member of St. James United Methodist Church; and WHEREAS, he has earned a great many accolades such as, the Liberty Bell Award presented by the Shreveport Bar Association, Dillard University's Distinguished Alumnus of the Year, Raymond Pace Alexander Award and the Judge William H. Hastie Award both presented by the National Bar Association, the Clyde E. Fant Memorial Award for Outstanding Community Service, the 2008 A.P. Tureaud Achievement Award from the Loyola University School of Law Black Law Students Association, the 2008 The Times Leadership Award sponsored by the Shreveport Times and the Alliance for Education and he was also named Louisiana Outstanding Young Man of the Year by the Louisiana Chapter of the Jaycees, and was the recipient of the Black Leader of the Year award from the Southern University Shreveport-Bossier Afro-American Society; and Page 2 of 3 SR NO. 122 ENROLLED WHEREAS, since 1972 he has been married to the former Jo Ann Southall, who is a registered nurse, and the couple have three grown children and three grandchildren; and WHEREAS, Judge Carl Stewart has led an exemplary life, working diligently as an attorney and a judge, being a family man and a person of faith, but primarily, Judge Stewart has been involved for more than forty-five years working for justice for all people and taking on the task of bettering the lives of people he has never met by ensuring that his decision in every case has been deeply considered and founded in the bedrock of the values enshrined in the Declaration of Independence and the United States Constitution that are the birthright of every American. THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby commend Carl E. Stewart on the end of his outstanding term as Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit and his return to active duty on the bench. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to Carl Stewart, Chief Judge for the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE Page 3 of 3