Louisiana 2019 2019 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR244 Enrolled / Bill

                    2019 Regular Session	ENROLLED
SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 244
BY SENATOR JOHNS 
A RESOLUTION
To commend the Immaculate Conception of the Blessed Virgin Mary Roman Catholic
Church on its sixtieth anniversary.
WHEREAS, the Immaculate Conception of the Blessed Virgin Mary Roman Catholic
Church (Immaculate Conception) was organized on July 5, 1959, to serve the spiritual needs
of the faithful residing in the rapidly growing community of Maplewood, Louisiana; and
WHEREAS, thirty-four families formed the first Christian community of Immaculate
Conception and gathered for services in the Maplewood public school auditorium; and
WHEREAS, today, the parish comprises more than six hundred fifty families who
worship in a large, modern church that was formally dedicated on January 29, 1984; and
WHEREAS, on November 26, 1950, Reverend Jules B. Jeanmard, Bishop of
Lafayette, blessed and dedicated the Chapel of the Immaculate Conception, thus becoming
the third mission of Our Lady of Prompt Succor Parish; and
WHEREAS, ten acres on Parish Road were purchased from Dr. Charles Fellows and
the chapel was moved onto the land which became the parish's permanent home; and
WHEREAS, eventually a larger facility was required to serve the increased Catholic
population of Maplewood and the chapel was enlarged and bricked; and
WHEREAS, the first Mass in the renovated building was celebrated by the Reverend
Denis Monahan, M.S. on April 5, 1959, and on July 5, 1959, the Most Reverend Maurice
Schexnayder blessed the building and announced the formation of Immaculate Conception
of the Blessed Virgin Mary Roman Catholic Church of Maplewood Parish, whereby
Reverend Henry Lenz, M.S. was appointed pastor of the new parish; and
WHEREAS, in its early days, it served about two hundred eighty families who were
residents of Maplewood, Hollywood, Magnolia Forest, Beverly Hills, and other residential
Page 1 of 3 SR NO. 244	ENROLLED
subdivisions adjacent to the city of Sulphur; and
WHEREAS, in 1959, the Simon Huval home across the street from the church was
purchased and converted into a rectory, and Father Lenz subsequently purchased a building
from the Lions Club of Maplewood, moved it to the church property, and developed it into
a catechetical center prior to leaving in 1962; and
WHEREAS, Father Lundgren cleared the debt on the rectory and had air
conditioning installed before being reassigned in 1967, and in 1968, Father Shahrigian paid
off the original debt; and
WHEREAS, the new Immaculate Conception Center was built and blessed on
October 28, 1971, parishioners continued to improve and renovate parish facilities, and a
new rectory was built and an open house was held on September 26, 1976; and
WHEREAS, shortly after Father Fitzsimmons left, a tragedy sparked the major
growth movement that has led to today's impressive physical plant; and
WHEREAS, on August 31, 1981, a major fire burned the church to the ground; and
WHEREAS, the fire raced quickly through the thirty-one year old structure and
nothing could be saved despite the heroic efforts of firemen, two of whom averted personal
harm when the roof collapsed and came crashing down about twenty feet from them; and
WHEREAS, losses included the irreplaceable pews made of a now extinct type of
chestnut wood which had previously been in a church in Hartford, Connecticut; and
WHEREAS, the fire raged for at least three hours as parishioners and friends could
only stand by and watch helplessly as the fire was well under way when the fire department
arrived; and
WHEREAS, shortly thereafter, the parishioners of Immaculate Conception wiped
away their tears, rolled up their sleeves, developed plans to build a new church, and
fundraising, along with tithing, produced the revenue required to commence construction;
and
WHEREAS, the Most Reverend Jude Speyrer and Father Bernier broke ground for
the new church at the site of the old building and the following year, Bishop Speyrer
returned to bless the new church and officiate at a combined Mass of Dedication and
twenty-fifth anniversary celebration; and
Page 2 of 3 SR NO. 244	ENROLLED
WHEREAS, on the bright Sunday morning of November 6, 1988, the religious
community of Immaculate Conception Parish witnessed another memorable fire as
Father Brunnert presided over a ritual burning of the mortgage of their brand new church at
Maplewood Drive and Shasta; and
WHEREAS, on July 7, 1990, the parish council drafted a list of needs, including
additional office space and a multi-purpose building with meeting rooms, recreational
facilities, and a larger parish hall; and
WHEREAS, construction of the complex, comprising a youth center and
administrative office along with the refurbishment of existing facilities, was accepted on
September 15, 1994, and blessed by Bishop Speyrer in October 1995; and
WHEREAS, pastors following Father Vecchio include Msgr. Vincent Sedita,
Father Aubrey Guilbeau, Father Gigo George, Father Edward Richard, and current pastor,
Father Tim Goodly; and
WHEREAS, throughout its history, thanks to dedicated pastors and hard-working
parishioners, Immaculate Conception of the Blessed Virgin Mary parish has refused to be
deterred by hardships and adversity, and signals its intention to serve uninterruptedly as an
inspirational and spiritual center of the community for years to come.
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana
does hereby commend and congratulate the parishioners of Immaculate Conception of the
Blessed Virgin Mary Roman Catholic Church on the celebration of its sixtieth anniversary
and does hereby express best thoughts and prayers for the congregation to remain faithful
in the work of the Lord.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to
Father Tim Goodly.
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
Page 3 of 3