Louisiana 2020 2020 1st Special Session

Louisiana House Bill HB13 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 201ES-33	ORIGINAL
2020 First Extraordinary Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 13
BY REPRESENTATIVE WRIGHT
TAX CREDITS:  Authorizes certain retail businesses to participate in the Enterprise Zone
incentive (Item #18)
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 51:1787(B)(3)(c) and (K) and to enact R.S. 51:1787(B)(3)(e),
3 relative to the Enterprise Zone incentive; to authorize certain businesses to
4 participate in the Enterprise Zone incentive program; to provide for effectiveness;
5 and to provide for related matters.
6Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
7 Section 1.  R.S. 51:1787(B)(3)(c) and (K) are hereby amended and reenacted and
8R.S. 51:1787(B)(3)(e) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 
9 ยง1787.  Enterprise zone incentives
10	*          *          *
11	B.  The board may enter into the contracts provided in Subsection A of this
12 Section provided that:
13	*          *          *
14	(3)
15	*          *          *
16	(c)(i)  Notwithstanding any other provision of law to the contrary, a business
17 that is assigned a North American Industry Classification Code of 5613 or 721, and
18 whose advance notification is not filed before April 1, 2016, shall be ineligible to
19 receive benefits pursuant to the provisions of this Section.
Page 1 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 201ES-33	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 13
1	(ii) Notwithstanding the provisions of Item (i) of this Subparagraph,  a retail
2 business assigned a North American Industry Classification Code of 721 shall be
3 eligible to receive benefits pursuant to this Section if the retail business files or
4 enters into an advance notification on or after July 1, 2020, and before December 31,
5 2021.  However, no retail business shall be eligible to receive benefits pursuant to
6 this Item after June 30, 2025.
7	*          *          *
8	(e)  In addition to the requirements of Subparagraph (a) of this Paragraph, a
9 retail business which is assigned a North American Industry Classification Code  of
10 44, 45, or 722 and which files or enters into an advance notification on or after July
11 1, 2020, and before December 31, 2021, shall be eligible to receive benefits pursuant
12 to the provisions of this Section.  However, no retail business shall be eligible to
13 receive benefits pursuant to this Subparagraph after June 30, 2025.
14	*          *          *
15	K. The department shall not accept any advance notification on or after
16 July 1, 2021 July 1, 2026.
17 Section 2.  This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2020; if vetoed by the governor
18and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1,
192020, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 13 Original 2020 First Extraordinary Session	Wright
Abstract:  Authorizes certain businesses such as retailers, hotels, and restaurants to
participate in the Enterprise Zone Program incentive. 
Present law establishes the Enterprise Zone Program (hereinafter "program") which
authorizes eligible businesses to enter into contracts with the Board of Commerce and
Industry to receive refundable income and franchise tax credits or state and local sales and
use tax rebate payments in exchange for the creation of a specified number of jobs that
involve employees who meet certain residency and other requirements.  Present law provides
for eligibility and qualifications for participation in the program. 
Page 2 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 201ES-33	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 13
Present law excludes certain retail businesses such as professional employment services,
hotels, and certain retail stores whose advance notification was not filed before April 1,
2016, from participating in the program.
Proposed law retains present law but expands eligibly for participation in the program to
businesses assigned a North American Industry Classification Code (NAICS) of 44, 45, 721,
or 722 for retailers, hotels, and restaurants.  Further requires those businesses to file or enter
into an advance notification between July 1, 2020, and Dec. 31, 2021, in order to be eligible
to participate in the program.
Proposed law prohibits businesses added by proposed law from participating in the program
after June 30, 2025.
Present law prohibits the Dept. of Economic Development from accepting any advance
notification on or after July 1, 2021.
Proposed law changes present law  to extend termination of the program from July 1, 2021,
to July 1, 2026.
  
Effective July 1, 2020.
(Amends R.S. 51:1787(B)(3)(c) and (K); Adds R.S. 51:1787(B)(3)(e))
Page 3 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.