ENROLLED 2020 First Extraordinary Session HOUSE BILL NO. 13 BY REPRESENTATIVES WRIGHT AND EDMONDS 1 AN ACT 2 To amend and reenact R.S. 51:1787(B)(3)(c) and (K) and to enact R.S. 51:1787(B)(3)(e), 3 relative to the Enterprise Zone incentive; to authorize certain businesses to 4 participate in the Enterprise Zone incentive program; to provide for effectiveness; 5 and to provide for related matters. 6 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 7 Section 1. R.S. 51:1787(B)(3)(c) and (K) are hereby amended and reenacted and 8 R.S. 51:1787(B)(3)(e) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 9 ยง1787. Enterprise zone incentives 10 * * * 11 B. The board may enter into the contracts provided in Subsection A of this 12 Section provided that: 13 * * * 14 (3) 15 * * * 16 (c)(i) Notwithstanding any other provision of law to the contrary, a business 17 that is assigned a North American Industry Classification Code of 5613 or 721, and 18 whose advance notification is not filed before April 1, 2016, shall be ineligible to 19 receive benefits pursuant to the provisions of this Section. 20 (ii) Notwithstanding the provisions of Item (i) of this Subparagraph, a retail 21 business assigned a North American Industry Classification Code of 721 and has no 22 more than fifty employees nationwide including affiliates prior to the contract Page 1 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HB NO. 13 ENROLLED 1 effective date shall be eligible to receive benefits pursuant to this Section if the retail 2 business files or enters into an advance notification on or after July 1, 2020, and 3 before December 31, 2021. However, no retail business shall be eligible to earn 4 benefits pursuant to this Item after June 30, 2023. 5 * * * 6 (e) In addition to the requirements of Subparagraph (a) of this Paragraph, a 7 retail business which is assigned a North American Industry Classification Code of 8 44, 45, or 722, has no more than fifty employees nationwide including affiliates prior 9 to the contract effective date, and which files or enters into an advance notification 10 on or after July 1, 2020, and before December 31, 2021, shall be eligible to receive 11 benefits pursuant to the provisions of this Section. However, no retail business shall 12 be eligible to earn benefits pursuant to this Subparagraph after June 30, 2023. 13 * * * 14 K. The department shall not accept any advance notification on or after 15 July 1, 2021 July 1, 2026. 16 Section 2. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2020; if vetoed by the governor 17 and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1, 18 2020, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later. SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF LOUISIANA APPROVED: Page 2 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions.