Louisiana 2020 2020 1st Special Session

Louisiana House Bill HB13 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law
or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 13 Original 2020 First Extraordinary Session	Wright
Abstract: Authorizes certain businesses such as retailers, hotels, and restaurants to participate in
the Enterprise Zone Program incentive. 
Present law establishes the Enterprise Zone Program (hereinafter "program") which authorizes
eligible businesses to enter into contracts with the Board of Commerce and Industry to receive
refundable income and franchise tax credits or state and local sales and use tax rebate payments in
exchange for the creation of a specified number of jobs that involve employees who meet certain
residency and other requirements.  Present law provides for eligibility and qualifications for
participation in the program. 
Present law excludes certain retail businesses such as professional employment services, hotels, and
certain retail stores whose advance notification was not filed before April 1, 2016, from participating
in the program.
Proposed law retains present law but expands eligibly for participation in the program to businesses
assigned a North American Industry Classification Code (NAICS) of 44, 45, 721, or 722 for retailers,
hotels, and restaurants.  Further requires those businesses to file or enter into an advance notification
between July 1, 2020, and Dec. 31, 2021, in order to be eligible to participate in the program.
Proposed law prohibits businesses added by proposed law from participating in the program after
June 30, 2025.
Present law prohibits the Dept. of Economic Development from accepting any advance notification
on or after July 1, 2021.
Proposed law changes present law  to extend termination of the program from July 1, 2021, to July
1, 2026.
  
Effective July 1, 2020.
(Amends R.S. 51:1787(B)(3)(c) and (K); Adds R.S. 51:1787(B)(3)(e))