Louisiana 2020 2020 1st Special Session

Louisiana House Bill HB13 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law
or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 13 Engrossed 2020 First Extraordinary Session	Wright
Abstract: Authorizes certain businesses such as retailers, hotels, and restaurants to participate in
the Enterprise Zone program incentive. 
Present law establishes the Enterprise Zone program (program) which authorizes eligible businesses
to enter into contracts with the Board of Commerce and Industry to receive refundable income and
franchise tax credits or state and local sales and use tax rebate payments in exchange for the creation
of a specified number of jobs that involve employees who meet certain residency and other
requirements.  Present law provides for eligibility and qualifications for participation in the program. 
Present law excludes certain retail businesses such as professional employment services, hotels, and
certain retail stores whose advance notification was not filed before April 1, 2016, from participating
in the program.
Proposed law retains present law but expands eligibility for participation in the program to
businesses assigned a North American Industry Classification Code (NAICS) of 44, 45, 721, or 722
for retailers, hotels, and restaurants.  Further requires those businesses to file or enter into an advance
notification between July 1, 2020, and Dec. 31, 2021, in order to be eligible to participate in the
program.
Proposed law prohibits businesses added by proposed law from participating in the program after
June 30, 2025.
Present law prohibits the Dept. of Economic Development from accepting any advance notification
on or after July 1, 2021.
Proposed law changes present law  to extend termination of the program from July 1, 2021, to July
1, 2026.
  
Effective July 1, 2020.
(Amends R.S. 51:1787(B)(3)(c) and (K); Adds R.S. 51:1787(B)(3)(e))