HLS 201ES-5 ORIGINAL 2020 First Extraordinary Session HOUSE BILL NO. 16 BY REPRESENTATIVES ECHOLS, BISHOP, MAGEE, AND SCHEXNAYDER TAX CREDITS: Establishes a tax credit for eligible expenses incurred in the rehabilitation of historic structures included on the National Register of Historic Places (Item #19) 1 AN ACT 2To amend and reenact R.S. 47:6019(A)(1)(a), relative to the tax credit for the rehabilitation 3 of historic structures; to provide with respect to the eligibility of certain rehabilitated 4 properties to qualify for the credit; to provide for the amount of the credit; to provide 5 for certain limitations and requirements; to provide for an effective date; and to 6 provide for related matters. 7Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 8 Section 1. R.S. 47:6019(A)(1)(a) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as 9follows: 10 ยง6019. Tax credit; rehabilitation of historic structures 11 A.(1)(a)(i) There shall be a credit against income and corporation franchise 12 tax for the amount of eligible costs and expenses incurred during the rehabilitation 13 of a historic structure located in a downtown development or a cultural district. The 14 amount of the credit shall equal twenty-five percent of the eligible costs and 15 expenses of the rehabilitation incurred prior to January 1, 2018, regardless of the 16 year in which the property is placed in service. The Except as provided for in Item 17 (ii) of this Subparagraph, the amount of the credit shall equal twenty percent of the 18 eligible costs and expenses of the rehabilitation incurred on or after January 1, 2018, 19 and before January 1, 2022, regardless of the year in which the property is placed in Page 1 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 201ES-5 ORIGINAL HB NO. 16 1 service. No credit is authorized pursuant to this Section for expenses incurred on or 2 after January 1, 2022. 3 (ii) Beginning July 1, 2020, there shall be a credit against income and 4 corporate franchise tax for the amount of eligible costs and expenses incurred during 5 the rehabilitation of a historic structure that is included on the National Register of 6 Historic Places as maintained by the National Park Service. The amount of the credit 7 shall be equal to thirty percent of the eligible costs and expenses of rehabilitation 8 incurred on or after July 1, 2020, and on or before June 30, 2026. In order to qualify 9 for the tax credit authorized by this Item, the eligible costs and expenses of 10 rehabilitation shall not exceed three million two hundred fifty thousand dollars. The 11 maximum annual amount of credit a taxpayer may claim pursuant to the provisions 12 of this Item shall not exceed seven hundred fifty thousand dollars. 13 * * * 14 Section 2. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2020; if vetoed by the governor 15and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1, 162020, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 16 Original 2020 First Extraordinary Session Echols Abstract: Establishes an additional income and franchise tax credit for 30% of eligible costs and expenses incurred during the rehabilitation of a historic structure included on the National Register of Historic Places. Further limits eligible rehabilitation expenses from exceeding $3.25M and caps the annual amount of credit a taxpayer may claim at $750,000. Present law authorizes an income and corporation franchise tax credit for the amount of eligible costs and expenses incurred during the rehabilitation of a historic structure located in a downtown development district or a cultural district. The amount of the credit is 20% of the eligible costs and expenses of the rehabilitation incurred before Jan. 1, 2022, and no taxpayer shall claim more than $5 million of credit annually for any number of structures rehabilitated within a particular downtown development or cultural district. The credit is effective for taxable years ending prior to Jan. 1, 2022. Proposed law retains present law but establishes, beginning July 1, 2020, an additional income and franchise tax credit for eligible costs and expenses incurred during the rehabilitation of a historic structure included on the National Register of Historic Places as Page 2 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 201ES-5 ORIGINAL HB NO. 16 maintained by the National Park Service. The amount of the credit shall equal 30% of the eligible costs and expenses of rehabilitation incurred on or after July 1, 2020, and before June 30, 2026. Further limits eligible costs and expenses of rehabilitation from exceeding $3.25M and caps the annual amount of credit a taxpayer may claim pursuant to proposed law at $750,000. Effective July 1, 2020. (Amends R.S. 47:6019(A)(1)(a)) Page 3 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions.