HLS 201ES-40 ORIGINAL 2020 First Extraordinary Session HOUSE BILL NO. 19 BY REPRESENTATIVE PRESSLY TAX/TAX REBATES: Extends eligibility requirements for certain industries to participate in the Quality Jobs Program (Item #18) 1 AN ACT 2To amend and reenact R.S. 51:2453(2)(c)(i) and to enact R.S. 51:2453(2)(b)(ix), relative to 3 the Quality Jobs Program; to authorize certain businesses to participate in the Quality 4 Jobs Program; to provide for effectiveness; and to provide for related matters. 5Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 6 Section 1. R.S. 51:2453(2)(c)(i) is hereby amended and reenacted and R.S. 751:2453(2)(b)(ix) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 8 ยง2453. Definitions 9 The following words or terms as used in this Chapter shall have the following 10 meaning, unless a different meaning appears from the context: 11 * * * 12 (2) 13 * * * 14 (b) To qualify for a contract pursuant to this Chapter, employers must meet 15 one of the following provisions: 16 * * * 17 (ix) The employer is a retail business which is assigned a North American 18 Industry Classification Code of 44, 45, 721, or 722 and the retail business files or 19 enters into an advance notification on or after July 1, 2020, and on or before 20 December 31, 2021. However, no retail business employer assigned a North Page 1 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 201ES-40 ORIGINAL HB NO. 19 1 American Industry Classification Code of 44, 45, 721, or 722 shall be eligible to 2 receive benefits pursuant to the provisions of this Chapter after June 30, 2025. 3 (c) The following employers or persons engaged in the following professions 4 or service industries shall not be eligible for any rebate under this Chapter: 5 (i)(aa) Retail employers as identified by the North American Industry 6 Classification System code sections 44 and 45. 7 (bb) Notwithstanding the provisions of Subitem (aa) of this Item, retail 8 employers identified by the North American Industry Classification Code of 44 and 9 45 shall be eligible to participate in this rebate program if such employers file or 10 enter into an advance notification on or after July 1, 2020, and on or before 11 December 31, 2021. However, no retail business employer assigned a North 12 American Industry Classification Code of 44 and 45 shall be eligible to receive 13 benefits pursuant to the provisions of this Chapter after June 30, 2025. 14 * * * 15 Section 2. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2020; if vetoed by the governor 16and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1, 172020, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 19 Original 2020 First Extraordinary Session Pressly Abstract: Authorizes certain businesses such as retailers, hotels, and restaurants to participate in the Quality Jobs Program incentive. Present law establishes the Quality Jobs Program (program) which authorizes eligible businesses to enter into contracts with the Board of Commerce and Industry to receive payroll, sales and use tax, or project facility expense tax rebates in exchange for the creation of certain jobs or promotion of other economic development. Present law provides for eligibility and qualifications for participation in the program. Present law allows certain employers such as businesses involved in biotechnology, manufacturing, the oil and gas industry, and the maintenance and repair of commercial transport aircraft to participate in the program. Present law further allows employers that are the corporate headquarters of multi-state businesses, businesses that spend more than 50% of their time performing services for an out-of-state parent company, have a certain Page 2 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 201ES-40 ORIGINAL HB NO. 19 threshold of out-of-state sales, or are located within a parish identified as being part of the lowest 25% of per capita income to participate in the program. Proposed law retains present law but expands eligibly for participation in the program to businesses assigned a North American Industry Classification Code of 44, 45, 721, or 722 for retailers, hotels, and restaurants. Further requires those businesses to file or enter into an advance notification on or after July 1, 2020, and on or before Dec. 31, 2021, in order to be eligible to participate in the program. Proposed law prohibits businesses added by proposed law from participating in the program after June 30, 2025. Effective July 1, 2020. (Amends R.S. 51:2453(2)(c)(i); Adds R.S. 51:2453(2)(b)(ix)) Page 3 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions.