HLS 201ES-423 ORIGINAL 2020 First Extraordinary Session HOUSE RESOLUTION NO. 43 BY REPRESENTATIVE LANDRY ATTORNEY GENERAL: Requests the attorney general to withdraw the state of Louisiana from the lawsuit challenging the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act 1 A RESOLUTION 2To urge and request the attorney general to withdraw the state of Louisiana from the lawsuit 3 challenging the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. 4 WHEREAS, on March 23, 2010, President Barack Obama signed H.R. 3590, the 5Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act of 2010, into law; and 6 WHEREAS, the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act is landmark legislation 7which provides greater access to health insurance and reshaped the way people may access 8health care treatment; and 9 WHEREAS, Louisiana began to implement certain provisions from the Act in 2013, 10such as providing access to insurance for Louisianans with pre-existing conditions and 11extending coverage for young adults; and 12 WHEREAS, open enrollment in the health insurance marketplace began October 1, 132013, in Louisiana; and 14 WHEREAS, the establishment of the health insurance marketplace, tax credits, and 15subsidies for low- and moderate-income Louisianans to afford insurance were implemented 16in 2014; and 17 WHEREAS, between 2013 and 2016, the numbers of uninsured individuals in 18Louisiana declined by over thirty percent, and that such decline is a direct result of the 19implementation of certain provisions of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act; and 20 WHEREAS, on July 1, 2016, Louisiana Governor John Bel Edwards issued 21Executive Order No. JBE 16-01 ordering the expansion of Medicaid in the state of Page 1 of 3 HLS 201ES-423 ORIGINAL HR NO. 43 1Louisiana, extending coverage to adults earning up to one hundred thirty-eight percent of the 2federal poverty level; and 3 WHEREAS, approximately five hundred thousand low income Louisianans receive 4health insurance coverage through the state's expansion of Medicaid, resulting in historically 5low uninsured rates in our state; and 6 WHEREAS, in February 2018, eighteen attorneys general and two governors filed 7suit in federal district court to challenge the constitutionality of the Patient Protection and 8Affordable Care Act's individual mandate and to seek a ruling on the constitutionality of the 9Act; and 10 WHEREAS, in September 2018, the attorney general of Louisiana joined Louisiana 11in the suit entitled Texas v. Azar, 945 F.3d 355 (5th Cir. 2019); and 12 WHEREAS, in December 2019, the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals remanded Texas 13v. Azar back to the lower district court; and 14 WHEREAS, on March 2, 2020, the United States Supreme Court granted a writ of 15certiorari to hear arguments in Texas v. Azar; and 16 WHEREAS, on May 24, 2019, Governor John Bel Edwards created the Protecting 17Louisiana Task Force through Executive Order No. JBE 19-4; and 18 WHEREAS, the purpose of the Protecting Louisiana Task Force was to study the 19impacts of the loss of health coverage and health protections that will occur if Texas v. Azar 20results in an invalidation of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act; and 21 WHEREAS, the task force reported that Louisiana will suffer a loss of revenue from 22the federal government in excess of three billion dollars if the Patient Protection and 23Affordable Care Act is invalidated; and 24 WHEREAS, the task force warned that the state of Louisiana will need to allocate 25five hundred thirty-six million additional dollars to replace the loss of federal subsidies that 26currently fund health care for people with pre-existing health conditions, because these funds 27will cease to exist if the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act is invalidated; and 28 WHEREAS, uninsured persons are more likely to be burdened with medical debt and 29unable to afford the cost of health care; and Page 2 of 3 HLS 201ES-423 ORIGINAL HR NO. 43 1 WHEREAS, as a result, many forego preventative care as well as treatment even 2after experiencing the debilitating manifestations associated with chronic illness and disease; 3and 4 WHEREAS, Louisiana's joinder to Texas v. Azar is not in the best interest of the state 5of Louisiana and, in particular, the health and welfare of its residents; and 6 WHEREAS, the invalidation of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act 7would be detrimental to those same citizens. 8 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the 9Legislature of Louisiana does hereby urge and request the attorney general of Louisiana to 10withdraw from the suit challenging the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. 11 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the 12attorney general of Louisiana. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HR 43 Original 2020 First Extraordinary Session Landry Requests the attorney general to withdraw the state of Louisiana from the lawsuit challenging the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. Page 3 of 3