HLS 20RS-473 ENGROSSED 2020 Regular Session HOUSE BILL NO. 143 BY REPRESENTATIVE COUSSAN AND SENATOR HENSGENS SUNSET LAW: Re-creates the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries 1 AN ACT 2To enact R.S. 49:191(12)(b) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(9)(d), relative to the Department of 3 Wildlife and Fisheries, including provisions to provide for the re-creation of the 4 Department of Wildlife and Fisheries and the statutory entities made a part of the 5 department by law; to provide for the effective termination date for all statutory 6 authority for the existence of such statutory entities; and to provide for related 7 matters. 8Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 9 Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries and the 10statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective June 30, 112020, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with the provisions of 12Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950. 13 Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of Wildlife and 14Fisheries and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created by Section 151 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2025, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the 16Department of Wildlife and Fisheries may be re-created prior to such date in accordance 17with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 181950. Page 1 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 20RS-473 ENGROSSED HB NO. 143 1 Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that 2those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act. 3 Section 4. R.S. 49:191(12)(b) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 4 ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; 5 phase-out period for statutory entities; table of dates 6 Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the 7 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their 8 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority 9 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of 10 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date: 11 * * * 12 (12) July 1, 2024: 13 * * * 14 (b) The Department of Wildlife and Fisheries and all statutory entities made 15 a part of the department by law. 16 Section 5. R.S. 49:191(9)(d) is hereby repealed in its entirety. 17 Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2020; if vetoed by the 18governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on 19June 30, 2020, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 143 Engrossed 2020 Regular Session Coussan Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of Wildlife and Fisheries. Present law (Sunset) provides that the Dept. of Wildlife and Fisheries and all statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2020, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2021, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Wildlife and Fisheries and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2020, in accordance with the "sunset" law. Proposed law supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for review and Page 2 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 20RS-473 ENGROSSED HB NO. 143 re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. Proposed law makes July 1, 2025, the new termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2024 unless the department is re- created again. Effective June 30, 2020. (Adds R.S. 49:191(12)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(9)(d)) Page 3 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions.