RÉSUMÉ DIGEST ACT 22 (HB 143) 2020 Regular Session Coussan Prior law (Sunset) provided that the Dept. of Wildlife and Fisheries and all statutory entities made a part of that department by law should begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2020, and that all legislative authority for such entities should cease as of July 1, 2021, unless the legislature enacted a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. New law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Wildlife and Fisheries and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2020, in accordance with the "sunset" law. New law supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for review and re- creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. New law makes July 1, 2025, the new termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2024 unless the department is re- created again. Effective June 30, 2020. (Adds R.S. 49:191(12)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(9)(d))