HLS 20RS-596 ORIGINAL 2020 Regular Session HOUSE BILL NO. 203 BY REPRESENTATIVE HUVAL SUNSET LAW: Provides relative to the re-creation of the Department of Culture, Recreation and Tourism 1 AN ACT 2To enact R.S. 49:191(13)(a) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(9)(b), relative to the Department of 3 Culture, Recreation and Tourism, including provisions for the re-creation of the 4 Department of Culture, Recreation and Tourism and the statutory entities made a part 5 of the department by law; to provide for the effective termination date for all 6 statutory authority for the existence of such statutory entities; and to provide for 7 related matters. 8Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 9 Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Culture, Recreation and 10Tourism and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created 11effective June 30, 2020, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with 12the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950. 13 Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of Culture, 14Recreation and Tourism and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created 15by Section 1 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2027, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, 16the Department of Culture, Recreation and Tourism may be re-created prior to such date in 17accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised 18Statutes of 1950. Page 1 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 20RS-596 ORIGINAL HB NO. 203 1 Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that 2those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act. 3 Section 4. R.S. 49:191(13)(a) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 4 ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase- 5 out period for statutory entities; table of dates 6 Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the 7 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their 8 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority 9 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of 10 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date: 11 * * * 12 (13) July 1, 2026: 13 (a) The Department of Culture, Recreation and Tourism and all statutory 14 entities made a part of the department by law. 15 Section 5. R.S. 49:191(9)(b) is hereby repealed in its entirety. 16 Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2020; if vetoed by the 17governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on 18June 30, 2020, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 203 Original 2020 Regular Session Huval Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of Culture, Recreation and Tourism for six more years. Changes termination date from July 1, 2021, to July 1, 2027. Present law (Sunset law) provides that the Dept. of Culture, Recreation and Tourism and all the statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2020, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2021, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Culture, Recreation and Tourism and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2020, in accordance with the "Sunset" law. Supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the Page 2 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 20RS-596 ORIGINAL HB NO. 203 department along with additional provisions. July 1, 2027, is the new termination date, and termination would begin July 1, 2026, unless the department is again re-created. Effective June 30, 2020. (Adds R.S. 49:191(13)(a); Repeals R.S. 49:191(9)(b)) Page 3 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions.