Louisiana 2020 2020 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB203 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 20RS-596	REENGROSSED
2020 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 203
BY REPRESENTATIVE HUVAL
SUNSET LAW:  Provides relative to the re-creation of the Department of Culture,
Recreation and Tourism
1	AN ACT
2To enact R.S. 49:191(12)(b) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(9)(b), relative to the Department of
3 Culture, Recreation and Tourism, including provisions for the re-creation of the
4 Department of Culture, Recreation and Tourism and the statutory entities made a part
5 of the department by law; to provide for the effective termination date for all
6 statutory authority for the existence of such statutory entities; and to provide for
7 related matters.
8Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
9 Section 1.  Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Culture, Recreation and
10Tourism and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created
11effective June 30, 2020, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with
12the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.
13 Section 2.  All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of Culture,
14Recreation and Tourism and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created
15by Section 1 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2025, pursuant to R.S. 49:191.  However,
16the Department of Culture, Recreation and Tourism may be re-created prior to such date in
17accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised
18Statutes of 1950.
Page 1 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 20RS-596	REENGROSSED
HB NO. 203
1 Section 3.  The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that
2those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.
3 Section 4.  R.S. 49:191(12)(b) is hereby enacted to read as follows:
4 ยง191.  Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-
5	out period for statutory entities; table of dates
6	Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the
7 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their
8 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority
9 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of
10 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:
11	*          *          *
12	(12)  July 1, 2024:
13	*          *          *
14	(b)  The Department of Culture, Recreation and Tourism and all statutory 
15 entities made a part of the department by law.
16 Section 5.  R.S. 49:191(9)(b) is hereby repealed in its entirety.
17 Section 6.  This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2020; if vetoed by the
18governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on
19June 30, 2020, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 203 Reengrossed 2020 Regular Session	Huval
Abstract:  Re-creates the Dept. of Culture, Recreation and Tourism for four more years. 
Changes termination date from July 1, 2021, to July 1, 2025.
Present law (Sunset law) provides that the Dept. of Culture, Recreation and Tourism and all
the statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their
operations on July 1, 2020, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as
of July 1, 2021, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the
department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Culture, Recreation and
Tourism and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2020, in accordance with the "Sunset"
Page 2 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 20RS-596	REENGROSSED
HB NO. 203
law.  Supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for review
and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the
department along with additional provisions.  July 1, 2025, is the new termination date, and
termination would begin July 1, 2024, unless the department is again re-created.
Effective June 30, 2020.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(12)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(9)(b))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The House Floor Amendments to the engrossed bill:
1. Change the date that termination would begin from July 1, 2026, to July 1, 2024.
Page 3 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.