Louisiana 2020 2020 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB203 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law
or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 203 Reengrossed 2020 Regular Session	Huval
Abstract:  Re-creates the Dept. of Culture, Recreation and Tourism for four more years.  Changes
termination date from July 1, 2021, to July 1, 2025.
Present law (Sunset law) provides that the Dept. of Culture, Recreation and Tourism and all the
statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on
July 1, 2020, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2021, unless
the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities
prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Culture, Recreation and Tourism
and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2020, in accordance with the "Sunset" law.  Supersedes
the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which
require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional
provisions.  July 1, 2025, is the new termination date, and termination would begin July 1, 2024,
unless the department is again re-created.
Effective June 30, 2020.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(12)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(9)(b))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The House Floor Amendments to the engrossed bill:
1. Change the date that termination would begin from July 1, 2026, to July 1, 2024.