Louisiana 2020 2020 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB203 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    RÉSUMÉ DIGEST
ACT 74 (HB 203) 2020 Regular Session	Huval
Prior law (Sunset law) provided that the Dept. of Culture, Recreation and Tourism and all
the statutory entities made a part of that department by law would begin to terminate their
operations on July 1, 2020, and that all legislative authority for such entities ceased as of
July 1, 2021.
New law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Culture, Recreation and Tourism
and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2020, in accordance with the "Sunset" law. 
Supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which set out the procedure for review and re-
creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the
department along with additional provisions.  July 1, 2025, is the new termination date, and
termination would begin July 1, 2024, unless the department is again re-created.
Effective June 30, 2020.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(12)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(9)(b))