HLS 20RS-332 ORIGINAL 2020 Regular Session HOUSE BILL NO. 506 BY REPRESENTATIVE DEVILLIER TAX/SEVERANCE TAX: Reduces the severance tax rate for oil over a certain period of time and clarifies the severance tax rate for oil produced from certain incapable wells 1 AN ACT 2To amend and reenact R.S. 47:633(7)(a), (b), and (c)(i)(aa), relative to severance tax; to 3 reduce the severance tax rate on oil over a certain period of time; to clarify the 4 severance tax rate on oil produced from certain wells; to provide for an effective 5 date; and to provide for related matters. 6Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 7 Section 1. R.S. 47:633(7)(a), (b), and (c)(i)(aa) are hereby amended and reenacted 8to read as follows: 9 ยง633. Rates of tax 10 The taxes on natural resources severed from the soil or water levied by R.S. 11 47:631 shall be predicated on the quantity or value of the products or resources 12 severed and shall be paid at the following rates: 13 * * * 14 (7)(a)(i) On oil twelve and one-half percentum of its value at the time and 15 place of severance, at the following rate: 16 (aa) Beginning January 1, 2020, through June 30, 2021, twelve and one-half 17 percent of its value at the time and place of severance. 18 (bb) Beginning July 1, 2021, through June 30, 2022, twelve percent of its 19 value at the time and place of severance. Page 1 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 20RS-332 ORIGINAL HB NO. 506 1 (cc) Beginning July 1, 2022, through June 30, 2023, eleven and one-half 2 percent of its value at the time and place of severance. 3 (dd) Beginning July 1, 2023, through June 30, 2024, eleven percent of its 4 value at the time and place of severance. 5 (ee) Beginning July 1, 2024, through June 30, 2025, ten and one-half 6 percent of its value at the time and place of severance. 7 (ff) Beginning July 1, 2025, through June 30, 2026, ten percent of its value 8 at the time and place of severance. 9 (gg) Beginning July 1, 2026, through June 30, 2027, nine and one-half 10 percent of its value at the time and place of severance. 11 (hh) Beginning July 1, 2027, through June 30, 2028, nine percent of its value 12 at the time and place of severance. 13 (ii) Beginning July 1, 2028, and thereafter, eight and one-half percent of its 14 value at the time and place of severance. 15 (ii) Such The value shall be the higher of (1) the gross receipts received from 16 the first purchaser, less charges for trucking, barging and pipeline fees, or (2) the 17 posted field price. In the absence of an arms length transaction or a posted field 18 price, the value shall be the severer's gross income from the property as determined 19 by R.S. 47:158(C). 20 (b) On oil produced from a well classified by the commissioner of 21 conservation as an oil well, and determined by the collector of revenue that such well 22 is incapable of producing an average of more than twenty-five barrels of oil per 23 producing day during the entire taxable month, and which also produces at least fifty 24 percent salt water per day, the tax rate applicable to the oil severed from such well 25 shall be one-half of the rate set forth in Subparagraph (a) of this Paragraph six and 26 one-quarter percent of its value at the time and place of severance and such well shall 27 be defined, for severance tax purposes, as an incapable well, provided that such well 28 has been certified by the Department of Revenue as incapable of such production on 29 or before the twenty-fifth day of the second month following the month of Page 2 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 20RS-332 ORIGINAL HB NO. 506 1 production. Oil severed from a multiple well lease or property is not subject to the 2 reduced rate of tax provided for herein, unless all such wells are certified as 3 incapable. 4 (c)(i)(aa) On oil produced from a well classified by the commissioner of 5 conservation as an oil well, and certified by the Department of Revenue that such 6 well is incapable of producing an average of more than ten barrels of oil per 7 producing day during the entire taxable month, the tax rate applicable to the oil 8 severed from such well shall be one-quarter of the rate set forth in Subparagraph (a) 9 of this Paragraph three and one hundred twenty-five thousandths percent of its value 10 at the time and place of severance and such well shall be defined, for severance tax 11 purposes, as a stripper well, provided that such well has been certified by the 12 Department of Revenue as a stripper well on or before the twenty-fifth day of the 13 second month following the month of production. Once a well has been certified and 14 determined to be incapable of producing an average of more than ten barrels of oil 15 per producing day during an entire month, such stripper well shall remain certified 16 as a stripper well until the well produces an average of more than ten barrels of oil 17 per day during an entire calendar month. 18 * * * 19 Section 2. This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not 20signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature 21by the governor, as provided by Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana. If 22vetoed by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become 23effective on the day following such approval. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 506 Original 2020 Regular Session DeVillier Abstract: Reduces the severance tax rate on oil over an eight-year period from 12.5% to 8.5% of its value at the time and place of severance and clarifies the severance tax rate for oil produced from certain incapable wells. Page 3 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 20RS-332 ORIGINAL HB NO. 506 Present law provides for the levy of an excise tax on natural resources severed from the soil or water, the rate for which shall be predicated on the quantity or value of the products or resources severed. Present law provides that the tax rate on oil is 12.5% of its value at the time and place of severance. The value of the oil shall be the higher of the gross receipts received from the first purchaser, less charges for trucking, barging and pipeline fees, or the posted field price. Proposed law reduces the tax rate on oil over an eight-year period from 12.5% as follows: (1)Beginning July 1, 2021, through June 30, 2022, to 12%. (2)Beginning July 1, 2022, through June 30, 2023, to 11.5%. (3)Beginning July 1, 2023, through June 30, 2024, to 11%. (4)Beginning July 1, 2024, through June 30, 2025, to 10.5%. (5)Beginning July 1, 2025, through June 30, 2026, to 10%. (6)Beginning July 1, 2026, through June 30, 2027, to 9.5%. (7)Beginning July 1, 2027, through June 30, 2028, to 9%. (8)Beginning July 1, 2028, and thereafter, to 8.5%. Present law provides for a reduced severance tax rate of 6.25% for oil produced from a well classified by the commissioner of conservation as an oil well, and determined by the Dept. of Revenue (DOR) that the well is incapable of producing an average of more than 25 barrels of oil per producing day during the entire taxable month, and which also produces at least 50% salt water per day. Further requires such a well to be defined, for severance tax purposes, as an incapable well, provided that the well has been certified by DOR as incapable of production on or before the 25th day of the second month following the month of production. Proposed law retains present law. Present law provides for a reduced severance tax rate of 3.125% for oil produced from a well classified by the commissioner of conservation as an oil well, and certified by DOR that the well is incapable of producing an average of more than 10 barrels of oil per producing day during the entire taxable month. Further requires such a well to be defined, for severance tax purposes, as a stripper well, provided that the well has been certified by DOR as a stripper well on or before the 25th day of the second month following the month of production. Proposed law retains present law. Effective upon signature of governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action. (Amends R.S. 47:633(7)(a), (b), and (c)(i)(aa)) Page 4 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions.